EP1454024 - LOCKING DEVICE SAFETY LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fichet Serrurerie Bâtiment - F.S.B. 80460 Oust-Marest / FR | [2006/09] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Fichet Serrurerie Bâtiment - F.S.B. 80460 Oust-Marest / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THEILLET, Christophe 13, place Saint Jacques F-76260 Eu / FR | 02 /
RIBEROLLES, Benoît 6, route Mancheville F-76260 Etalondes / FR | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein, 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02793192.2 | 28.10.2002 | [2004/37] | WO2002FR03696 | Priority number, date | FR20010016134 | 13.12.2001 Original published format: FR 0116134 | [2004/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03050369 | Date: | 19.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1454024 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1454024 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05B29/00 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
E05B29/0033 (EP);
E05B29/0066 (EP);
E05B29/0013 (EP);
E05B29/0026 (EP);
E05B29/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNGS-SICHERHEITSSCHLOSS | [2004/37] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE SAFETY LOCK | [2004/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE POUR SERRURE DE SURETE | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 15.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.03.2006 | CZ | 01.03.2006 | EE | 01.03.2006 | FI | 01.03.2006 | GB | 01.03.2006 | IE | 01.03.2006 | NL | 01.03.2006 | SK | 01.03.2006 | TR | 01.03.2006 | BG | 01.06.2006 | DK | 01.06.2006 | SE | 01.06.2006 | GR | 02.06.2006 | LU | 28.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 01.03.2006 | |
EE | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
GB | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
TR | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
LU | 28.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 01.03.2006 | |
EE | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
GB | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 01.03.2006 | |
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
GB | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
GB | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
GB | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
GB | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SK | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
BG | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]CH87515 (JOSEPH ABBE [CH]) [X] 1,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1109154 (PATRIGNANI THEO) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US4942749 (RABINOW JACOB [US]) [X] 1-3,11 * column 2, line 26 - column 5, line 41; figures 1-16 *; | [A]GB2266918 (BURTON STEPHEN ARTHUR [AU]) [A] 1,11 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 24; figures 1-13 * |