EP1460644 - ELECTROCONDUCTIVE COMPOSITION, ELECTROCONDUCTIVE COATING AND METHOD FOR FORMING ELECTROCONDUCTIVE COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | ||
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome, Kohtoh-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Katsuhiko, c/o Fujikura Ltd. 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-0812 / JP | 02 /
OHMORI, Kiwako, c/o Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-0812 / JP | 03 /
ENDO, Masanori, c/o Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-0812 / JP | 04 /
YASUHARA, Hikaru, c/o Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku, Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | 05 /
ONO, Akinobu, c/o Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku, Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | 06 /
IMAI, Takayuki, c/o Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-0812 / JP | 07 /
KUROSAWA, Yukihiko, c/o Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku, Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | 08 /
ZAIMA, Hiroaki, c/o Kansai Research Institute Kyoto Research Park,17, Chudoji-Minami-machi Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8813 / JP | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/39] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, K., c/o Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-0812 / JP | ||
02 /
OHMORI, Kiwako, c/o Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-0812 / JP | |||
03 /
ENDO, Masanori, c/o Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-0812 / JP | |||
04 /
YASUHARA, Hikaru, c/o Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku, Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | |||
05 /
ONO, Akinobu, c/o Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku, Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | |||
06 /
IMAI, Takayuki, c/o Fujikura Ltd., Sakura Works 1440, Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi, Chiba 285-0812 / JP | |||
07 /
KUROSAWA, Yukihiko, c/o Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohtoh-ku, Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | |||
08 /
ZAIMA, H., c/o Kansai Research Institute, Inc. Kyoto Research Park,17, Chudoji-Minami-machi Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8813 / JP | Representative(s) | Verdure, Stéphane Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Verdure, Stéphane Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02793374.6 | 25.12.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002JP13502 | Priority number, date | JP20010398425 | 27.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001398425 | JP20020115438 | 17.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002115438 | [2004/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03056574 | Date: | 10.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1460644 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1460644 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/22, H01B5/00, H05K1/09, C09D5/24 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
H01B1/22 (EP,US);
H01B1/16 (KR);
C09D5/24 (EP,KR,US);
H05K1/095 (EP,US);
H05K3/321 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1157 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [2007/30] |
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROLEITFÄHIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, ELEKTROLEITFÄHIGE BESCHICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG EINER ELEKTROLEITFÄHIGEN BESCHICHTUNG | [2004/39] | English: | ELECTROCONDUCTIVE COMPOSITION, ELECTROCONDUCTIVE COATING AND METHOD FOR FORMING ELECTROCONDUCTIVE COATING | [2004/39] | French: | COMPOSITION ELECTROCONDUCTRICE, REVETEMENT ELECTROCONDUCTEUR ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION D'UN REVETEMENT ELECTROCONDUCTEUR | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2004 | Translation filed | 28.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 20.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07001372.7 / EP1775734 | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH0417398 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPH0431463 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPH0554716 (N E CHEMCAT CORP); | [A]JPH10183209 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [A]JP2001240984 (HITACHI LTD) |