EP1461306 - QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS ANTIMUSCARINIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHARDS, Ivan 3533 E. D Avenue Kalamazoo, MI 49004 / US | 02 /
CAMMARATA, Sue, K. 10147 Point O'Woods Drive Portage, MI 49002 / US | 03 /
WEGNER, Craig, D. 25850 North Arrowhead Drive Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | 04 /
HAWLEY, Michael 201 Sunnywood Drive Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US | 05 /
WARCHOL, Mark, P. 422 Timer Ridge Drive Kalamazoo, MI 49006 / US | 06 /
KONTNY, Mark 2343 Huntington Lake Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 07 /
MOROZOWICH, Walter 5330 Chickadee Kalamazoo, MI 49002 / US | 08 /
KOLBASA, Karen, P. 11632 Shaver Road Schoolcraft, MI 49087 / US | 09 /
MOON, Malcolm, W. 3750 Rosemere Street Kalamazoo, MI 49004 / US | 10 /
BONAFOUX, Dominique 7337 Pershing, Apartment 1W St. Louis, MO 63130 / US | 11 /
WOLFSON, Sergey, G. 15599 Hitchcock Road Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 12 /
LENNON, Patrick, J. 50 Wilshire Terrace Webster Groves, MO 63119 / US | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Hayles, James Richard Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Hayles, James Richard Pfizer Limited, Patents Department, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02793840.6 | 25.10.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002US34529 | Priority number, date | US20010348930P | 26.10.2001 Original published format: US 348930 P | US20020361979P | 06.03.2002 Original published format: US 361979 P | US20020391521P | 25.06.2002 Original published format: US 391521 P | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03035599 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1461306 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1461306 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/27, C07C211/29, C07C215/54, C07C215/66, C07C219/28, C07D295/02, C07C217/62, A61K31/14, A61K31/452, A61K31/40, A61P11/00 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
C07D295/096 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C215/54 (EP,US);
C07C215/66 (EP,US);
C07C217/62 (EP,US);
C07C219/28 (EP,US);
C07C237/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | QUATERNÄRE AMMONIUMVERBINDUNGEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ANTIMUSCARINISCHE WIRKSTOFFE | [2004/40] | English: | QUATERNARY AMMONIUM COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS ANTIMUSCARINIC AGENTS | [2004/40] | French: | COMPOSES D'AMMONIUM QUATERNAIRES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS ANTIMUSCARINIQUES | [2008/28] |
Former [2004/40] | COMPOSES D'AMMONIUM QUATERNAIRE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS ANTIMUSCARINIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2592191 (WAYNE RUDDY ARLO) [A] 1-34 * column 1, line 1 - line 11; claim - *; | [AD]US5382600 (JOENSSON NILS A [SE], et al) [AD] 1-34 * column 31 - column 36; claim -; table 1 *; | [A] - WEBER R W, "ROLE OF ANTICHOLINERGICS IN ASTHMA", ANNALS OF ALLERGY, AMERICAN COLLEGE OF ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY,, US, (199011), vol. 65, ISSN 0003-4738, pages 348 - 360, XP000979858 [A] 27-34 * the whole document * | by applicant | - ANIMAL WELFARE ACT REGULATION, (1985), vol. 1 AND 2, pages 85 - 23 |