EP1458702 - LUMINACIN ANALOGS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 4-6-10, Koishikawa, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 4-6-10, Koishikawa, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANG, Frank 16 Greybirch Road Andover, MA 01810 / US | 02 /
JOHANNES, Charles 5 Graham Avenue Newbury, MA 01951 / US | 03 /
YAO, Ye 9 Andrew Circle North Andover, MA 01845 / US | 04 /
ZHU, Xiaojie (Jeff) 12 Linda Road Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | King, Elizabeth Caroline, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02794322.4 | 18.12.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002US40744 | Priority number, date | US20010343678P | 28.12.2001 Original published format: US 343678 P | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03057685 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458702 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1458702 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D309/10, A61K31/351, A61P35/00 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
C07D493/10 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D309/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUMINACINE ANALOGE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2004/39] | English: | LUMINACIN ANALOGS AND USES THEREOF | [2004/39] | French: | ANALOGUES DE LUMINACINE, ET UTILISATIONS CORRESPONDANTES | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 24.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2005 | BE | 13.04.2005 | CH | 13.04.2005 | CZ | 13.04.2005 | EE | 13.04.2005 | FI | 13.04.2005 | IT | 13.04.2005 | LI | 13.04.2005 | NL | 13.04.2005 | SI | 13.04.2005 | SK | 13.04.2005 | TR | 13.04.2005 | BG | 13.07.2005 | DK | 13.07.2005 | GR | 13.07.2005 | SE | 13.07.2005 | ES | 24.07.2005 | PT | 13.09.2005 | CY | 18.12.2005 | IE | 19.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
EE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
CY | 18.12.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
EE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
IE | 19.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SK | 13.04.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
CH | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
LI | 13.04.2005 | ||
NL | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
SI | 13.04.2005 | ||
BG | 13.07.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 13.04.2005 | |
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 13.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XD] - NARUSE ET AL, "Luminacins: a family of capillary tube formation inhibitors from streptomyces sp. I. Taxonomy, fermentation, isolation, physico-chemical properties and structure elucidation", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, JAPAN ANTIBIOTICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION. TOKYO, JP, (200006), vol. 53, no. 6, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 579 - 590, XP002955014 [XD] 1-21 * figure 1 * | [XD] - WAKABAYSHI T KAGEYAMA-KAWASE R NARUSE N, "Luminacins: a family of capillary tube formation inhibitors from streptomyces sp. II. Biological activities", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, JAPAN ANTIBIOTICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION. TOKYO, JP, (200006), vol. 53, no. 6, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 591 - 596, XP002955015 [XD] 22-42 * the whole document * | [X] - SHARMA ET AL, "UCS15A, a non-kinase inhibitor of Src signal transduction", ONCOGENE, BASINGSTOKE, HANTS, GB, (200104), vol. 20, no. 17, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 2068 - 2079, XP002955013 [X] 1-42 * Abstract Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1204296 | [X] - TATSUTA K ET AL, "The first total synthesis and establishment of absolute structure of luminacins C1 and C2", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20011022), vol. 42, no. 43, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 7625 - 7628, XP004307962 [X] 1-42 * Schemes 1 to 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)01657-4 |