EP1451150 - PRODUCTION OF ISOCYANATES IN THE GASEOUS PHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÖLFERT, Andreas Kärlegartenstrasse 12 74906 Bad Rappenau / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Christian Neckarpromenade 25/188 68167 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
STRÖFER, Eckhard Karl-Kuntz-Weg 9 68163 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
PFEFFINGER, Joachim BASF AG/GPP/PT-D219 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
WEBER, Markus Mundenheimerstrasse 158 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
KNÖSCHE, Carsten Am Gutenbrunnen 25 67150 Niederkirchen / DE | [2004/36] | Application number, filing date | 02795066.6 | 19.11.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002EP12930 | Priority number, date | DE2001158160 | 28.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158160 | [2004/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03045900 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451150 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451150 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C263/10 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
C07C263/10 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C263/10, C07C265/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON ISOCYANATEN IN DER GASPHASE | [2004/36] | English: | PRODUCTION OF ISOCYANATES IN THE GASEOUS PHASE | [2004/36] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ISOCYANATES EN PHASE GAZEUSE | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 02.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.01.2010 | CZ | 13.01.2010 | DK | 13.01.2010 | EE | 13.01.2010 | FI | 13.01.2010 | IE | 13.01.2010 | SE | 13.01.2010 | SK | 13.01.2010 | TR | 13.01.2010 | BG | 13.04.2010 | GR | 14.04.2010 | PT | 13.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/07] | CY | 13.01.2010 | |
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 13.01.2010 | |
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 13.01.2010 | |
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CY | 13.01.2010 | |
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 13.01.2010 | |
IE | 13.01.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 13.01.2010 | |
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | PT | 13.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0289840 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]EP0570799 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1* example -; claim - * |