EP1451766 - METHOD, SYSTEM OF DEVICES, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A PRINTED DOCUMENT FROM SEVERAL INPUT FILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCÉ Printing Systems GmbH Siemensallee 2 85586 Poing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Océ Printing Systems GmbH Siemensallee 2 85586 Poing / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIR, Manfred Seb.-Pöttinger-Weg 5a 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 02 /
TISCHLER, Karl, M. Berliner Strasse 106 86633 Neuburg/Donau / DE | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg, Karl-Heinz Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Schaumburg, Karl-Heinz Patentanwälte Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02795130.0 | 09.12.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002EP13933 | Priority number, date | DE2001160607 | 10.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10160607 | [2004/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03054783 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451766 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451766 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/00 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G06K15/00 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0062 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR [2006/08] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, GERÄTESYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES GEDRUCKTEN DOKUMENTS AUS MEHREREN EINGANGSDATEIEN | [2005/31] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM OF DEVICES, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A PRINTED DOCUMENT FROM SEVERAL INPUT FILES | [2004/36] | French: | PROCEDE, SYSTEME D'APPAREILS ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR DESTINES A LA PRODUCTION D'UN DOCUMENT IMPRIME A PARTIR DE PLUSIEURS FICHIERS D'ENTREE | [2004/36] |
Former [2004/36] | VERFAHREN, GER TESYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZU R ERZEUGUNG EINES GEDRUCKTEN DOKUMENTS AUS MEHREREN EINGANGSDATEIEN | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 03.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0068877 (OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-21 * page 8, line 13 - page 17, line 13 * * page 19, line 31 - page 26, line 27 * * figures 2-16 *; | [A]EP0753833 (OCE NEDERLAND BV [NL]); | [DA]US5398289 (ROURKE JOHN L [US], et al) |