EP1579572 - PEAK POWER LIMITATION IN AN AMPLIFIER POOLING SCENARIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIPKA, Dietmar Kastanienweg 11 92348 Berg / DE | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 02795259.7 | 20.12.2002 | [2005/39] | WO2002EP14680 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004057758 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579572 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/60, H04B7/06 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
H04W52/346 (EP,US);
H03F1/02 (EP,US);
H03F1/0205 (EP,US);
H03F1/3241 (EP,US);
H03F3/211 (EP,US);
H03F3/24 (EP,US);
H03F3/602 (EP,US);
H03F3/68 (EP,US);
H04B7/0408 (EP,US);
H04B7/0491 (EP,US);
H04L27/368 (EP,US);
H04W52/42 (EP,US);
H04W52/52 (EP,US);
H03F2200/204 (EP,US);
H03F2200/435 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEGRENZUNG DER SPITZENLEISTUNG IN EINER GRUPPE VON PARALLEL ARBEITENDEN VERSTÄRKERN | [2005/39] | English: | PEAK POWER LIMITATION IN AN AMPLIFIER POOLING SCENARIO | [2005/39] | French: | LIMITATION DE LA PUISSANCE DE CRETE DANS UN SCENARIO DE REGROUPEMENT D'AMPLIFICATEURS | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 03.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/36] | 29.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/36] | 19.04.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6233436 (DENT PAUL W [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7-10,12,13,15,16 * column 1, line 46 - line 66 * * column 2, line 57 - line 59 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 5 * * column 7, line 47 - line 55 * * column 9, line 13 - line 29 * * figures 1A,1B,2,15,16 * [Y] 2,6,11,14; | [Y]GB2376613 (WIRELESS SYSTEMS INT LTD [GB]) [Y] 2,11 * page 1 * * page 4 - page 6 * * figure 1A *; | [YA]US5825762 (KAMIN JR RALPH A [US], et al) [Y] 6,14 * column 2, line 1 - line 65 * * column 4, line 6 - line 61 * * figures 1,2,6 * [A] 1,3-10,12-16; | [A]US5783969 (LUZ YUDA YEHUDA [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 54 * * column 5, line 23 - line 38 * |