EP1561290 - PASSIVE DEVICE FOR INCREASING THE TRANSMISSION EFFECTIVENESS OF RADIO FREQUENCY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MC, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messier-Bugatti-Dowty Inovel Parc Sud 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2016/03] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Messier-Bugatti-Dowty Inovel Parc Sud 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | ||
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states MESSIER-BUGATTI Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states MESSIER-BUGATTI Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | |||
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
For all designated states MESSIER-BUGATTI Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | |||
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOCATELLI, Marcel 4, pré Morard F-38330 Monbonnot / FR | 02 /
THOMAS, Thierry 7, lot. de la Treille Impasse la Treille F-38760 Varces Allières et Risset / FR | [2016/03] |
Former [2005/32] | 01 /
LOCATELLI, Marcel 4, pré Morard F-38330 Monbonnot / FR | ||
02 /
THOMAS, Thierry 7, lot. de la Treille, Impasse la Treille F-38760 Varces Allières et Risset / FR | Representative(s) | Parzy, Benjamin Alain Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [2016/03] |
Former [2007/16] | Parzy, Benjamin Alain Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/32] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02795364.5 | 05.11.2002 | [2005/32] | WO2002FR03780 | Priority number, date | FR20010014536 | 09.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0114536 | [2005/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03041295 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561290 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561290 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, G06K7/10, B60C23/04 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
H04B5/73 (EP,US);
G06K7/10178 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/32] | H04B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | PASSIVE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ÜBERTRAGUNGSEFFIZIENZ VON FUNKFREQUENZSYSTEMEN | [2005/32] | English: | PASSIVE DEVICE FOR INCREASING THE TRANSMISSION EFFECTIVENESS OF RADIO FREQUENCY SYSTEMS | [2005/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF PASSIF D'ACCROISSEMENT DE L'EFFICACITÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SYSTÈMES RADIOFRÉQUENCE | [2015/28] |
Former [2005/32] | DISPOSITIF PASSIF D'ACCROISSEMENT DE L'EFFICACITE DE TRANSMISSION DE SYSTEMES RADIOFREQUENCE | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.2004 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 10.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/52] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/32] | 19.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2007/32] | 03.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/not-exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE SK TR | Licencee: | Sagem Defence Securite S.A. Le Ponant de Paris, 27 Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Date: | 08.04.2010 | [2010/30] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | ES | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | IT | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | NL | 20.01.2016 | SE | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/19] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
SE | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
ES | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
IT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
NL | 20.01.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 20.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19700110 (SCHLEIFRING & APPARATEBAU GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO0026989 (NEDAP NV [NL], et al) | Examination | US4642786 | US5033295 |