12.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
09.11.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
24.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
15.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
08.12.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] |
27.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
06.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
22.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
04.08.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
16.12.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] |
30.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.10.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.06.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.01.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
28.01.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
08.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
10.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
07.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|