EP1448474 - LIQUID DISPENSING TAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flextainer S.A. Zone Industrielle 57370 Schalbach / FR | [2004/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSER, Philippe 31, rue de la Gare F-67330 Dossenheim-sur-Zinsel / FR | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02795398.3 | 25.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002FR04037 | Priority number, date | FR20010015274 | 26.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0115274 | [2004/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03045833 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1448474 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1448474 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B67D3/04 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
B67D3/043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAPFHAHN FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2004/35] | English: | LIQUID DISPENSING TAP | [2004/35] | French: | ROBINET DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDES | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 28.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2006 | CY | 01.02.2006 | CZ | 01.02.2006 | EE | 01.02.2006 | FI | 01.02.2006 | IE | 01.02.2006 | NL | 01.02.2006 | SK | 01.02.2006 | BG | 01.05.2006 | GR | 02.05.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4693400 (FRAHM CARL E [US], et al) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 10; figures 4,5 *; | [DA]US5553745 (MCMILLIAN RAY M [US]) [DA] 1* column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 5; figure - *; | [AD]US6045119 (ERB RENE [FR]) [AD] 1 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US6296157 (ERB RENE [FR]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 58 - line 65 * * column 4, line 32 - line 33 * * figures 3,4,10 * |