EP1430339 - FIBER OPTIC PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Cable Systems LLC 800 17th St NW P.O. Box 489 Hickory, NC 28603 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Corning Cable Systems 800 17th St NW, P.O. Box 489 Hickory North Carolina 28603 / US | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Corning Cable Systems 800 17th St NW, P.O. Box 489 Hickory, North Carolina 28603 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDONALD, A., John PO Box 624 Lenoir, NC 28645 / US | 02 /
MELTON, Stuart, R. PO Box 2261 Hickory, NC 28603 / US | 03 /
TRAN, Hieu, V. 1628 Paddock Circle Charlotte, NC 28209 / US | 04 /
LUTHER, James, P. 2471 Rolling Ridge Drive Hickory, NC 28601 / US | 05 /
CHILDERS, Darrell, R. 2730 24th Street Court NE Hickory, NC 28601 / US | [2004/33] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
MCDONALD, A., John PO Box 624 Lenoir, NC 28645 / US | ||
02 /
MELTON, Stuart, R. PO Box 2261 Hickory, NC 28603 / US | |||
03 /
TRAN, Hieu, V. 1628 Paddock Circle Charlotte, NC 28209 / US | |||
04 /
LUTHER, James, P. 2471 Rolling Ridge Drive Hickory, NC 28601 / US | |||
05 /
CHILDERS, Darrell, R. 2730 25th Street Court NE Hickory, NC 28601 / US | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Sturm, Christoph, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Quermann & Richardt, Unter den Eichen 7 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02795494.0 | 27.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002US30719 | Priority number, date | US20010967259 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 967259 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03050579 | Date: | 19.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1430339 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1430339 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1430339 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
G02B6/3897 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/36 (KR);
G02B6/3869 (EP,US);
G02B6/3888 (EP,US);
G02B6/3894 (EP,US);
G02B6/545 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | G02B6/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECKER FÜR OPTISCHE FASERN | [2004/26] | English: | FIBER OPTIC PLUG | [2004/26] | French: | PRISE DE FIBRE OPTIQUE | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 02.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07001238.0 / EP1775610 | EP10010485.0 / EP2293128 | EP14163384.2 / EP2762935 | EP14166143.9 / EP2772778 | EP15181352.4 / EP2983025 | EP19171204.1 / EP3550342 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.2007 | CH | 07.03.2007 | CY | 07.03.2007 | CZ | 07.03.2007 | DK | 07.03.2007 | EE | 07.03.2007 | FI | 07.03.2007 | LI | 07.03.2007 | SK | 07.03.2007 | TR | 07.03.2007 | BG | 07.06.2007 | SE | 07.06.2007 | GR | 08.06.2007 | PT | 07.08.2007 | IE | 27.09.2007 | LU | 27.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
BG | 07.06.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
IE | 27.09.2007 | ||
LU | 27.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
IE | 27.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
IE | 27.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
IE | 27.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4354731 (MOUISSIE BOB) [Y] 15,24-28 * column 5, line 3 - line 9; figure 6 *[A] 1-14,16-23; | [Y]EP0855610 (HIROSE ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 13,14,25 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 52; figures 7A-7D,8 *; | [Y]EP0940700 (PORTA SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [Y] 6,8-10,12-14,25,28 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 1 * * column 4, line 40 - line 56; figures 1,11 *; | [XY]EP0949522 (MOLEX INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7,11,16-23 * column 5, line 50 - column 7, line 23; figures 7-10 * [Y] 6,8-10,12-15,24-28; | [YA]EP1065542 (SIECOR OPERATIONS LLC [US]) [Y] 15,24-28 * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 7; figures 1A,1B * [A] 1-14,16-23 | Examination | US5028114 | EP0468671 | EP0547778 | WO0127660 |