EP1456354 - ADIPOSE TISSUE-DERIVED STROMAL CELLS FOR THE REPAIR OF CORNEAL AND INTRA-ORBITAL DEFECTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Artecel Sciences, Inc. 905 West Main Street, Box 44, Suite 25-B Durham, NC 27701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Artecel Sciences, Inc. 905 West Main Street, Box 44, Suite 25-B Durham, NC 27701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEATHAM, Bentley 4800 University Dr Durham, NC 27707 / US | 02 /
GIMBLE, Jeffrey, M. 16 Glenmore Road Chapel Hill, NC 27516 / US | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02795611.9 | 08.11.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002US35967 | Priority number, date | US20010347605P | 09.11.2001 Original published format: US 347605 P | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03039481 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1456354 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, C12N5/02, C12N5/06, A01N63/00, A01N65/00, A01N43/04, A61K31/70 | [2004/38] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS FETTGEWEBE STAMMENDE STROMAZELLEN ZUR REPARATUR VON HORNHAUT- UND INTRAORBITAL-DEFEKTEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2004/38] | English: | ADIPOSE TISSUE-DERIVED STROMAL CELLS FOR THE REPAIR OF CORNEAL AND INTRA-ORBITAL DEFECTS AND USES THEREOF | [2004/38] | French: | CELLULES STROMALES DERIVEES D'UN TISSU ADIPEUX POUR LA REPARATION DE DEFAUTS CORNEENS ET INTER-ORBITAUX AINSI QUE LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/43] | 18.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP07018107.8 / EP1892289 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0053795 (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * page 24 - page 26 *; | [Y]WO0162901 (ARTECEL SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * page 26 - page 31 *; | [A] - GIMBLE J M ET AL, "Adipose tissue: Derived stromal cells are multipotent", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, & TWENTY-SECOND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH; TORONTO, ONTARIO, CANADA; SEPTEMBER 22-26, 2000, (200009), vol. 15, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0884-0431, page S508, XP000972512 [A] 1-28 * abstract * | International search | [X] - AZUARA-BLANCO A. ET AL., "Amniotic membrane transplantation for ocular surface reconstruction", BR. J. OPTHAMOL., (1999), vol. 83, pages 399 - 402, XP001149427 | [X] - MELLER D. ET AL., "Conjunctival epithelial cell differentiation on amniotic membrane", INVESTIGATIVE OPTHALMOLOGY AND VISUAL SCIENCE, (199904), vol. 40, no. 5, pages 878 - 886, XP002965716 | [X] - TSUBOTA K. ET AL., "Adenovirus-mediated gene transfer to the ocular surface epithelium", EXP. EYE RES., (1998), vol. 67, pages 531 - 538, XP002965715 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exer.1998.0557 |