EP1448200 - (4-PHENYL)PIPERIDIN-3-YL-PHENYLCARBOXYLATE DERIVATIVES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS AS BETA-SECRETASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | |||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | |||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Elan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 800 Gateway Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHN, Varghese 1722 - 18th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | 02 /
MOON, Joseph, B. 2203 Sheffield Drive Kalamazoo, MI 49008 / US | 03 /
PULLEY, Shon, R. 13850 Kellogg School Road Hickory Corners, MI 49060 / US | 04 /
RICH, Daniel, H. 2978 Woods Edge Way Madison, WI 53711 / US | 05 /
BROWN, David, L. 15504 Twingate Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 06 /
JAGODZINSKA, Barbara 1485 Kentfield Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 07 /
JACOBS, Jon, S. 103 Merriweather Lane Kalamazoo, MI 49006 / US | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Nargolwalla, Cyra Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Nargolwalla, Cyra Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2004/35] | Nargolwalla, Cyra Cabinet Plasseraud, 65/67 rue de la Victoire 75009 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02795653.1 | 19.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002US37037 | Priority number, date | US20010332708P | 19.11.2001 Original published format: US 332708 P | US20020383167P | 24.05.2002 Original published format: US 383167 P | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03043987 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1448200 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/451, C07D211/42, C07D407/04, C07D413/04 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/451 (KR);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D211/40 (EP,US);
C07D211/42 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | 01.06.2004 | LT | 01.06.2004 | LV | 01.06.2004 | MK | 01.06.2004 | RO | 01.06.2004 | SI | 01.06.2004 | Title | German: | DERIVATE DES (4-PHENYL)PIPERIDIN-3-YL-PHENYLCARBOXYLATS UND VERWANDTE VERBINDUNGEN ALS BETA-SECRETASE INHIBITOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ALZHEIMER | [2004/35] | English: | (4-PHENYL)PIPERIDIN-3-YL-PHENYLCARBOXYLATE DERIVATIVES AND RELATED COMPOUNDS AS BETA-SECRETASE INHIBITORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE | [2004/35] | French: | PIPERIDINES ET PIPERAZINES 3,4-DISUBSTITUEES, 3,5-DISUBSTITUEES ET 3,4,5-SUBSTITUEES | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 08.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4745122 (LASSEN JOERGEN B [DK]) [X] 1-33,35-58 * column 1, line 7 - line 9 *; | [X]EP0296721 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK]) [X] 1-58 * page 3, line 37; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0316718 (FERROSAN AS [DK]) [X] 1-58 * page 3, paragraph 1 * * compounds of formulae (I) and (II) *; | [X]WO9709311 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-33,35-58 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9912532 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1-33,35-58 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0979819 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-33,35-58 * example 7 *; | [X]WO0020390 (UNIV GEORGETOWN [US]) [X] 1-58 * page 6, line 1 * * example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO02066469 (AVENTIS PHARMA INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-58* page 26, line 35; examples 2,3 *; | [PX]WO02076440 (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-58 * page 1, paragraph 2; example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO02088101 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [PX] 1-58 * page 1, paragraph 1; example -; claim - *; | [X] - BURSAVICH, MATTHEW G. ET AL, "Solid-Phase Synthesis of Aspartic Peptidase Inhibitors: 3-Alkoxy-4-Aryl Piperidines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 135:226867, URL: STN, XP002237590 [X] 1-33,36-58 * abstract * | [ ] - ORGANIC LETTERS (2001), 3(17), 2625-2628 | [X] - VIEIRA, ERIC ET AL, "Substituted piperidines - highly potent renin inhibitors due to induced fit adaptation of the active site", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 131:102177, URL: STN, XP002237591 [X] 1-33,38-58 * abstract * | [ ] - BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS (1999), 9(10), 1397-1402 | [X] - BURSAVICH, MATTHEW G. ET AL, "From Peptides to Non-Peptide Peptidomimetics: Design and Synthesis of New Piperidine Inhibitors of Aspartic Peptidases", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 135:210920, URL: STN, XP002237592 [X] 1-33,35-58 * abstract * | [ ] - ORGANIC LETTERS (2001), 3(15), 2317-2320 | [X] - OEFNER, C. ET AL, "Renin inhibition by substituted piperidines: a novel paradigm for the inhibition of monomeric aspartic proteinases?", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 131:2120, URL: STN, XP002237593 [X] 1-33,35-58 * abstract * | [ ] - CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY (1999), 6(3), 127-131 | [X] - MCERLANE K M J ET AL, "STEREOCHEMISTRY OF 3-METHYL-4-PHENYLPIPERIDINES DERIVED FROM CORRESPONDING 4-PHENYL-4-PIPERIDINOLS", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL. OTTAWA, CA, (1972), vol. 50, no. 13, ISSN 0008-4042, pages 2149 - 2151, XP000995803 [X] 1-33,35-58 * example 2C * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/v72-345 | [X] - ROGERS G A ET AL, "THE MOST INTERESTING MEMBERS OF THE AH5183 FAMILY OF DRUGS", CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR BASIS OF COLINERGIC FUNCTION, XX, XX, (1987), pages 333 - 337, XP001056296 [X] 1-33,35-58 * example 13 * |