29.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
13.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
13.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
13.11.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
19.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
12.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
29.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
22.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
25.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
13.06.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
30.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
21.03.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
30.11.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.05.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.12.2006 |
First examination report |
|
23.12.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
28.01.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
18.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2004 |
Change - inventor |
published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] |
10.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
10.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
05.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|