Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6923211 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2005 | B2 | US2004108007 | 10.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70750303 | 18.12.2003 | US24876703 | 14.02.2003 | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6976505 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2005 | B2 | US2004108006 | 10.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24876703 | 14.02.2003 | US70750203 | 18.12.2003 | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7131460 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2006 | B2 | US2004103947 | 03.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 | US60547303 | 01.10.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6688333 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2004 | B2 | US2003106595 | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24876703 | 14.02.2003 | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005510668 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 | US0237924 | 26.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002360427 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2003 | A8 | AU2002360427 | 10.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 | US0237924 | 26.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1448877 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2008 | B1 | EP1448877 | 25.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 | US0237924 | 26.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2436222 | 05.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 | US0237924 | 26.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60224437T | 28.08.2008 | T2 | DE60224437D1 | 14.02.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 | US0237924 | 26.11.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03046342 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2004 | A8 | WO03046342 | 18.09.2003 | B1 | WO03046342 | 05.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE382781T | 15.01.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6681805 | 27.01.2004 | B2 | US2003098077 | 29.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US99711801 | 28.11.2001 |