EP1449275 - EFFICIENT MULTIPLE INPUT MULTIPLE OUTPUT SYSTEM FOR MULTI; PATH FADING CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | ||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZEIRA, Ariela 239 West Neck Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Frohwitter, Bernhard Frohwitter, Patent.- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02795708.3 | 27.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002US38344 | Priority number, date | US20010334246P | 29.11.2001 Original published format: US 334246 P | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03047032 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449275 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
H04B7/0613 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0413 (KR);
H04B7/0837 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0242 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2025/03375 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/35] | H01Q21/00, H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTES MIMO-SYSTEM FÜR MEHRFACH-WEGE-FADING-KANÄLE | [2004/35] | English: | EFFICIENT MULTIPLE INPUT MULTIPLE OUTPUT SYSTEM FOR MULTI; PATH FADING CHANNELS | [2004/35] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENTREES MULTIPLES ET DE SORTIES MULTIPLES EFFICACE POUR VOIES MULTITRAJETS SUJETTES A EVANOUISSEMENT | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 02.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6144711 (RALEIGH GREGORY G [US]) [I] 1-38 * figures 1-4,7,10, * * column 9, line 22 - column 18, line 65 *; | [I]EP1117197 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [I] 1-38 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A] - BINNING CHEN ET AL, "Frequency Domain Blind MIMO System Identification Based on Second- and Higher Order Statistics", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010801), vol. 49, no. 8, ISSN 1053-587X, XP011059363 [A] 1-38 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5550810 (MONOGIOUDIS PANTELIS N [GR], et al); | [A]US2002154705 (WALTON JAY R [US], et al); | [A]US6473467 (WALLACE MARK [US], et al); | [A]US2002165626 (HAMMONS A ROGER [US], et al); | [A]US2002177447 (WALTON JAY ROD [US], et al) |