EP1461431 - VARIANTS OF ADP-GLUCOSE PYROPHOSPHORYLASE AFFECTING PHOSPHATE SENSITIVITY AND OTHER PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, SK | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | 11.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC. Division of Sponsored Research, 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, Florida 32611 / US | [2010/14] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC. Division of Sponsored Research, 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, Florida 32611 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANNAH, Curtis, L. 4400 NW 39th Avenue, 434 Gainesville, FL 32606 / US | 02 /
Cross, Joanna Marie-France Max Planck Inst. für Molekulare Pflanzenphysiologie Am Mühlenberg 1, 14476 Golm / DE | [2010/14] |
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
HANNAH, Curtis, L. 4400 NW 39th Avenue, 434 Gainesville, FL 32606 / US | ||
02 /
Cross, Joanna Marie-France Max Planck Inst. fur Molekulare Pfanzenphysiologie Am Muhlenberg 1, 14476 Golm / DE | Representative(s) | Roberts, Michael Austin Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Roberts, Michael Austin Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02795720.8 | 03.12.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002US38545 | Priority number, date | US20010338083P | 03.12.2001 Original published format: US 338083 P | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03047527 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1461431 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1461431 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, C12N15/54, C12N15/62, C12N15/82, C12P19/04, C12P21/02, A01H5/00 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
C12N9/1241 (EP,US);
C12N15/8245 (EP,US);
C12N15/8261 (EP,US);
C12N15/8271 (EP,US);
C12N15/8273 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIE PHOSPHATEMPFINDLICHKEIT UND ANDERE PARAMETER BEEINFLUSSENDE ADP-GLUCOSE-PYROPHOSPHORYLASE-VARIANTEN | [2004/40] | English: | VARIANTS OF ADP-GLUCOSE PYROPHOSPHORYLASE AFFECTING PHOSPHATE SENSITIVITY AND OTHER PARAMETERS | [2004/40] | French: | VARIANTS DE ADP-GLUCOSE PYROPHOSPHORYLASE AFFECTANT LA SENSIBILITE AU PHOSPHATE ET D'AUTRES PARAMETRES | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 27.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2009 | 17.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.09.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10001868.8 / EP2186900 | EP10011423.0 / EP2275550 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.04.2010 | EE | 07.04.2010 | SK | 07.04.2010 | [2011/10] |
Former [2011/09] | EE | 07.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9907841 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [A] * page 16, paragraph 2 *; | [X] - DU JARDIN P ET AL, "ISOLATION AND SEQUENCE ANALYSIS OF A COMPLEMENTARY DNA CLONE ENCODING A SUBUNIT OF THE ADP GLUCOSE PYROPHOSPHORYLASE OF POTATO TUBER AMYLOPLASTS", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 349 - 351, XP002321575 [X] 7-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00020568 | [A] - LAUGHLIN ET AL, "N- and C-terminal peptide sequences are essential for enzyme assembly, allosteric, and/or catalytic properties of ADP-glucose pyrophosphorylase", PLANT JOURNAL, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, (199804), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 0960-7412, pages 159 - 168, XP002127957 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.1998.00102.x | [A] - GREENE T W ET AL, "Generation of up-regulated allosteric variants of potato ADP-glucose pyrophosphorylase by reversion genetics", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19980801), vol. 95, no. 17, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10322 - 10327, XP002096426 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.17.10322 | [A] - RUDI H ET AL, "A (HIS)6-TAGGED RECOMBINANT BARLEY (HORDEUM VULGARE L.) ENDOSPERM ADP-GLUCOSE PYROPHOSPHORYLASE EXPRESSED IN THE BACULOVIRUS-INSECT CELL SYSTEM IN INSENSITIVE TO ALLOSTERIC REGULATION BY 3-PHOSPHOGLYCERATE AND INORGANIC PHOSPHATE", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19971208), vol. 419, no. 1, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 124 - 130, XP000882835 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(97)01448-8 | [A] - GIROUX M J ET AL, "ADP-glucose pyrophosphorylase in shrunken-2 and brittle-2 mutants of maize", MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (1994), vol. 243, no. 4, ISSN 0026-8925, pages 400 - 408, XP002138022 [A] * the whole document * | [T] - CROSS JOANNA M ET AL, "Both subunits of ADP-glucose pyrophosphorylase are regulatory", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY (ROCKVILLE), (200405), vol. 135, no. 1, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 137 - 144, XP002321576 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.103.036699 | [T] - SINGH SALVINDER ET AL, "Expression, kinetics and regulatory properties of native and recombinant ADP-glucose pyrophosphorylase isoforms from chickpea.", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY (PARIS), (200305), vol. 41, no. 5, ISSN 0981-9428, pages 399 - 405, XP002321577 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0981-9428(03)00046-9 | International search | [Y]US6184438 (HANNAH L CURTIS [US]); | [Y] - BALLICORA ET AL., "Construction, expression and characterization of chimeric ADP-glucose pyrophosphorylases made using the potato (solanum tuberosum L.) tuber and cyanobacterial enzymes", FASEB JOURNAL, (1999), vol. 13, no. 7, page A1533, XP002969291 | [Y] - HANNAH ET AL., "Maize genes encoding the small subunit of ADP-glucose pyrophosphorylase", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (200109), vol. 127, no. 1, pages 173 - 183, XP002966582 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.127.1.173 | [Y] - SHAW ET AL., "Genomic nucleotide sequence of a wild-type shrunken-2 allele of zea mays", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 98, no. 3, pages 1214 - 1216, XP002138024 | [Y] - BALLICORA ET AL., "Heat stability of the potato tuber ADP-glucose pyrophosphorylase: role of the cys residue 12 in the small subunit", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1999), vol. 257, no. 3, pages 782 - 786, XP002969292 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.0469 | [Y] - GIROUX ET AL., "The large subunit of the embryo isoform of ADP glucose pyrophosphorylase from maize", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (199507), vol. 108, no. 3, pages 1333 - 1334, XP002969293 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.108.3.1333 | [Y] - BALLICORA ET AL., "Construction of chimeric enzymes combining the ADP glucose pyrophosphorylases from escherichia coli and anabaena PCC 7210", FASEB JOURNAL, (2001), vol. 15, no. 4, page A203, XP002969294 | [Y] - BALLICORA ET AL., "Adenosine 5'-diphosphate-glucose pyrophosphorylase from potato tuber", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (199509), vol. 109, no. 1, pages 245 - 251, XP002060466 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.109.1.245 | [Y] - GREENE ET AL., "Enhanced stability of maize endosperm ADP-glucose pyrophosphorylase is gained through mutants that alter subunit interactions", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (199810), vol. 95, no. 22, pages 13342 - 13347, XP002127956 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.22.13342 | [Y] - BALLICORA ET AL., "ADP-glucose pyrophosphorylase from potato tubers: site-directed mutagenesis studies of the regulatory sites", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (199809), vol. 118, no. 1, pages 265 - 274, XP002969295 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.118.1.265 |