EP1420998 - MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING A DRIVEN REAR WHEEL AND TWO ARTICULATED FRONT WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hans Leeb Zweirad Handel GmbH Bahnhofplatz 3 9400 Wolfsberg / AT | [2006/18] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Hans Leeb Zweirad Handel Gmbh Banhofplatz 3 9400 Wolfsberg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEEB, Hans Bahnhofplatz 3 A-9400 Wolfsberg / AT | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 02796181.2 | 27.08.2002 | [2004/22] | WO2002AT00252 | Priority number, date | AT20010001372 | 30.08.2001 Original published format: AT 13722001 | [2004/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03018390 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1420998 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1420998 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62K5/04, B62K25/24 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
B62K5/08 (EP);
B62K25/24 (EP);
B62K5/027 (EP);
B62K5/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTORFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM ANGETRIEBENEN HINTERRAD UND ZWEI GELENKTEN VORDDERRÄDERN | [2004/22] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING A DRIVEN REAR WHEEL AND TWO ARTICULATED FRONT WHEELS | [2004/22] | French: | VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE DOTE D'UNE ROUE ARRIERE ENTRAINEE ET DE DEUX ROUES AVANT MOTRICES | [2004/22] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 09.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.05.2006 | CZ | 03.05.2006 | EE | 03.05.2006 | FI | 03.05.2006 | GB | 03.05.2006 | IE | 03.05.2006 | NL | 03.05.2006 | SK | 03.05.2006 | TR | 03.05.2006 | BG | 03.08.2006 | DK | 03.08.2006 | SE | 03.08.2006 | GR | 04.08.2006 | LU | 27.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | CH | 31.08.2006 | LI | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | PT | 03.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
GB | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
TR | 03.05.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
LU | 27.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
GB | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
GB | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
GB | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
GB | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
GB | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
GB | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
GB | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 03.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1063473 (NSU WERKE AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2486899 (TOWNSEND ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4723785 (KAWAGUCHI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US4834408 (DE CORTANZE ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [DA]WO9721583 (MUCCIO ROMEO [IT]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29701408U (CONSTIN DESIGN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6263994 (EITEL FREDERICK G [US]) [A] 1 * column W * | by applicant | WO9721583 |