EP1448781 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING TARGET EPITOPES OF THE T CELL MEDIATED IMMUNE RESPONSE AND FOR ASSAYING EPITOPE-SPECIFIC T CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lophius Biosciences GmbH Am BioPark 13 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Lophius Biosciences GmbH Josef-Engert-Strasse 9 93053 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Deml, Ludwig Schneitwegerstrasse 30 93128 Regenstauf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deml, Ludwig Schneitwegerstrasse 30 93128 Regenstauf / DE | [2008/08] |
Former [2004/35] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Dehmel, Albrecht, et al Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstraße 11 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Dehmel, Albrecht, et al Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte, Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Dehmel, Albrecht, Dr. Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte, Herzogspitalstrasse 11 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02796502.9 | 20.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002DE04270 | Priority number, date | DE2001156863 | 20.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10156863 | [2004/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03046212 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1448781 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1448781 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/85, C12N5/10, G01N33/50 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
C12N15/1086 (EP,US);
C07K14/70532 (EP,US);
C07K14/70575 (EP,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
G01N33/505 (EP,US);
G01N33/6878 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON ZIELEPITOPEN DER T-ZELL-VERMITTELTEN IMMUNANTWORT UND ZUM NACHWEIS EPITOP-SPEZIFISCHER T-ZELLEN | [2004/35] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING TARGET EPITOPES OF THE T CELL MEDIATED IMMUNE RESPONSE AND FOR ASSAYING EPITOPE-SPECIFIC T CELLS | [2004/35] | French: | PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION D'EPITOPES CIBLES DE LA REPONSE IMMUNITAIRE INDUITE PAR LES LYMPHOCYTES T ET DE DETECTION DES LYMPHOCYTES T SPECIFIQUES A L'EPITOPE | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Request for further processing for: | 30.05.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 30.05.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.07.2007 | CZ | 18.07.2007 | DK | 18.07.2007 | EE | 18.07.2007 | FI | 18.07.2007 | NL | 18.07.2007 | SK | 18.07.2007 | TR | 18.07.2007 | BG | 18.10.2007 | SE | 18.10.2007 | GR | 19.10.2007 | ES | 29.10.2007 | PT | 18.12.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/34] | CY | 18.07.2007 | |
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 18.07.2007 | |
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 18.07.2007 | |
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 18.07.2007 | |
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 18.07.2007 | |
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 18.07.2007 | |
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 18.07.2007 | |
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 29.10.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0057705 (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US]) [A] * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 13 *; | [A]WO0067761 (UNIV WAKE FOREST [US], et al) [A] * example 22 *; | [A]WO0132204 (POWDERJECT VACCINES INC [US]) [A] * page 4, line 12 - page 6, line 8 *; | [A] - TAKAYAMA T ET AL, "TRANSDUCTION OF DENDRITIC CELL PROGENITORS WITH A RETROVIRAL VECTOR ENCODING VIRAL INTERLEUKIN-10 AND ENHANCED GREEN FLUORESCENT PROTEIN ALLOWS PURIFICATION OF POTENTIALLY TOLEROGENIC ANTIGEN-PRESENTING CELLS", TRANSPLANTATION, (19991227), vol. 68, no. 12, ISSN 0041-1337, pages 1903 - 1909, XP000943559 [A] * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00007890-199912270-00015 |