12.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
08.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
27.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
02.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] |
05.10.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
24.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
27.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
27.04.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
23.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
16.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
09.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
15.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
24.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] |
19.05.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
12.05.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.05.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.11.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.09.2005 |
Change: Reply to examination report |
|
13.09.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.03.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.02.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
11.02.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
24.01.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2004 |
First examination report |
|
17.09.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
23.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|