EP1454331 - CONTACT SUPPORTING SHAFT FOR A LOW-VOLTAGE POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Service S.r.l Via Vittor Pisani 16 20124 Milano / IT | [2004/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZZOLA, Lucio Via Guglielmo D'Alzano, 8 I-24100 Bergamo / IT | 02 /
ZANCHI, Eligio Via Grumello, 24 I-24022 Alzano Lombardo / IT | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Giavarini, Francesco Zanoli & Giavarini S.p.A. Via Melchiorre Gioia, 64 20125 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | Giavarini, Francesco ZANOLI & GIAVARINI S.r.l. Viale Bianca Maria, 35 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02796609.2 | 10.12.2002 | [2004/37] | WO2002EP14072 | Priority number, date | IT2001MI02587 | 10.12.2001 Original published format: IT MI20012587 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03050830 | Date: | 19.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1454331 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1454331 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/34 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
H01H1/226 (EP,US);
H01H9/342 (EP,US);
H01H2009/0088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTAKTARME TRAGENDE SCHALTWELLE FÜR EINEN NIEDERSPANNUNGSSCHUTZSCHALTER | [2004/37] | English: | CONTACT SUPPORTING SHAFT FOR A LOW-VOLTAGE POWER CIRCUIT BREAKER | [2004/37] | French: | TIGE DE SUPPORT DE CONTACTS POUR UN DISJONCTEUR DE PUISSANCE A FAIBLE TENSION | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | BE | 21.06.2006 | CY | 21.06.2006 | CZ | 21.06.2006 | EE | 21.06.2006 | SI | 21.06.2006 | SK | 21.06.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | LU | 10.12.2006 | IE | 11.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
LU | 10.12.2006 | ||
IE | 11.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 11.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 11.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 11.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 21.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5262744 (ARNOLD DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 4 * column 4, line 56 *; | [Y]JP2000113798 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 10* figure 1 *; | [XY]US6259338 (BOEDER FRANZ [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * abstract * [Y] 4,10 |