EP1462101 - DRINKABLE PREPARATION COMPRISING KETOPROFEN AND USE THEREOF IN THE SIMULTANEOUS TREATMENT OF A GROUP OF ANIMALS OF RESPIRATORY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/40] | DRINKABLE PREPARATION COMPRISING KETOPROFEN AND THE USE THEREOF IN THE SIMULTANEOUS TREATMENT OF A GROUP OF ANIMALS FOR PROCESSES WHICH ARE ACCOMPANIED BY FEVER, INFLAMMATION AND/OR PAIN | ||
[2006/39] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Revocation of patent | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A. Av. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | [2007/10] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A. Av. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOMEDES BEGUER, Josep Avda. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 08041 BARCELONA / ES | 02 /
SOLANAS IBARRA, Pedro, Juan Travessera de les corts 262-266, esc. B10 1a 08014 BARCELONA / ES | 03 /
L PEZ CABRERA, Antonio Avda. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 08041 BARCELONA / ES | 04 /
LIZCANO GARC A, Javier Avda. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 08041 BARCELONA / ES | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
HOMEDES BEGUER, Josep Avda. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 08041 BARCELONA / ES | ||
02 /
SOLANAS IBARRA, Pedro, Juan Avda. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 08041 BARCELONA / ES | |||
03 /
L PEZ CABRERA, Antonio Avda. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 08041 BARCELONA / ES | |||
04 /
LIZCANO GARC A, Javier Avda. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 08041 BARCELONA / ES | Representative(s) | Peters, Hajo, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Peters, Hajo, et al Albihns Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Peters, Hajo, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Peters, Hajo, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Peters, Hajo, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/40] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L., Alcalá, 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 02796784.3 | 11.12.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002ES00590 | Priority number, date | ES20010002744 | 11.12.2001 Original published format: ES 200102744 | [2004/40] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03053430 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462101 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462101 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/192, A61K9/08, A61P29/00 | [2004/40] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 05.07.2004 | LV | 05.07.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 05.07.2004 | Title | German: | DRINKBARE ZUBEREITUNG MIT KETOPROFEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN DER SIMULTANBEHANDLUNG EINER GRUPPE VON TIEREN VON ATEMWEGKRANKHEITEN | [2006/39] | English: | DRINKABLE PREPARATION COMPRISING KETOPROFEN AND USE THEREOF IN THE SIMULTANEOUS TREATMENT OF A GROUP OF ANIMALS OF RESPIRATORY DISEASES | [2006/39] | French: | PREPARATION BUVABLE COMPRENANT DU KETOPROFENE ET UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES RESPIRATOIRES DANS UN GROUPE D'ANIMAUX DE MANIERE SIMULTANEE | [2006/39] |
Former [2004/40] | "DRINKBARE ZUBEREITUNG MIT KETOPROFEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN DER SIMULTANBEHANDLUNG EINER GRUPPE VON TIEREN FÜR VERFAHREN, BEGLEITET VON FIEBER, ENDZÜNDUNG UND/ODER SCHMERZEN" | ||
Former [2004/40] | DRINKABLE PREPARATION COMPRISING KETOPROFEN AND THE USE THEREOF IN THE SIMULTANEOUS TREATMENT OF A GROUP OF ANIMALS FOR PROCESSES WHICH ARE ACCOMPANIED BY FEVER, INFLAMMATION AND/OR PAIN | ||
Former [2004/40] | PREPARATION BUVABLE COMPRENANT DU KETOPROFENE ET UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE PROCESSUS ACCOMPAGNES DE FIEVRE, D'INFLAMMATION ET/OU DE DOULEUR, CHEZ UN GROUPE D'ANIMAUX, DE MANIERE SIMULTANEE | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2004 | Translation filed | 05.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2007
17.02.2010
WITHDRAWN Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al, et al df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 02
06.12.2007
28.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Labiana Life Sciences, S.A.U. C/Venus, 26 Can Parellada Industrial 08228 Terrassa (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2007
17.02.2010
WITHDRAWN Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al, et al df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
06.12.2007
28.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Labiana Life Sciences, S.A.U. C/Venus, 26 Can Parellada Industrial 08228 Terrassa (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2007
28.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al, et al df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
06.12.2007
28.05.2008
ADMISSIBLE Labiana Life Sciences, S.A.U. C/Venus, 26 Can Parellada Industrial 08228 Terrassa (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.12.2007
Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US Opponent's representative Dörries, Hans Ulrich, et al, et al df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
02
06.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE Labiana Life Sciences, S.A.U. C/Venus, 26 Can Parellada Industrial 08228 Terrassa (Barcelona) / ES Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 02.06.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.12.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.04.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.03.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 11.03.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/25] | 16.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 17.06.2011 | Appeal received No. T1374/11 | 12.08.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.03.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 15.06.2011 | Appeal received | 12.08.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.03.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.2007 | BE | 07.03.2007 | CH | 07.03.2007 | CY | 07.03.2007 | CZ | 07.03.2007 | EE | 07.03.2007 | FI | 07.03.2007 | LI | 07.03.2007 | SI | 07.03.2007 | SK | 07.03.2007 | TR | 07.03.2007 | BG | 07.06.2007 | SE | 07.06.2007 | GR | 08.06.2007 | PT | 07.08.2007 | IE | 11.12.2007 | LU | 11.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
BG | 07.06.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
IE | 11.12.2007 | ||
LU | 11.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
IE | 11.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
IE | 11.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
IE | 11.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9507103 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [X]WO9745113 (SEPRACOR INC [US]); | [XP]EP1226831 (BAIOCCHI LEANDRO [IT], et al); | [XP]US2002169212 (STROBLE MICHAEL [US], et al) |