EP1446004 - EXOGENOUS PROTEIN EXPRESSION SYSTEM IN AN AVIAN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivalis Lieudit la Corbière 49450 Roussay / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE (INRA) 147, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states ENS - Ecole Normale Supérieure de Lyon 46, Allée d'Italie 69000 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Vivalis Lieudit la Corbière 49450 Roussay / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE (INRA) 147, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique - CNRS 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | |||
For all designated states ENS - Ecole Normale Supérieure de Lyon 46, Allée d'Italie 69000 Lyon / FR | |||
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Vivalis Lieudit la Corbière 49450 Roussay / FR | ||
For all designated states Institut National de la Recherche Agronomique (INRA) 147, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique - CNRS 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | |||
For all designated states Ens - Ecole Normale Superieure de Lyon 46, Allée d'Italie 69000 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAIN, Bertrand 4 bis, place Bir-Hakeim F-69003 Lyon / FR | 02 /
SAMARUT, Jacques 169 bis, route de Genas F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 03 /
VALARCHE, Isabelle 4-6, rue Jules Vallès F-44100 Nantes / FR | 04 /
CHAMPION-ARNAUD, Patrick 13, avenue du Rayon vert F-44300 Nantes / FR | 05 /
SOBCZYK, André 53-55, Bd de la Fraternité F-44100 Nantes / FR | 06 /
KUNITA, Ryota Room Number 302, City Doyama B, Aikoh 480-3 Atsugi-shi, 243-0035 Kanagawa / JP | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2004/34] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau, 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02796854.4 | 21.11.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002FR03992 | Priority number, date | FR20010015111 | 22.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0115111 | [2004/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03043415 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1446004 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446004 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C12N15/90, C12N15/63, C12N15/06, C12P21/00 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
A01K67/0275 (EP,US);
A23L15/20 (EP,US);
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
C12N15/902 (EP,US);
A01K2207/15 (EP,US);
A01K2217/00 (EP,US);
A01K2217/072 (EP,US);
A01K2227/30 (EP,US);
A01K2267/01 (EP,US);
C12N2830/008 (EP,US);
C12N2830/32 (EP,US);
C12N2830/90 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AVIÄRES EXPRESSIONSSYSTEM FÜR FREMDPROTEINE | [2004/34] | English: | EXOGENOUS PROTEIN EXPRESSION SYSTEM IN AN AVIAN SYSTEM | [2004/34] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXPRESSION DE PROTEINES EXOGENES DANS UN SYSTEME AVIAIRE | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.04.2008 | CY | 30.04.2008 | CZ | 30.04.2008 | DK | 30.04.2008 | EE | 30.04.2008 | FI | 30.04.2008 | IT | 30.04.2008 | NL | 30.04.2008 | SK | 30.04.2008 | TR | 30.04.2008 | BG | 30.07.2008 | GR | 31.07.2008 | SE | 31.07.2008 | ES | 10.08.2008 | PT | 30.09.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
CY | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
TR | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
CY | 30.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
IT | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
EE | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
CZ | 30.04.2008 | ||
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
SK | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
DK | 30.04.2008 | ||
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
SE | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 30.04.2008 | |
FI | 30.04.2008 | ||
NL | 30.04.2008 | ||
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
PT | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 30.04.2008 | |
BG | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 10.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9747739 (UNIV MICHIGAN STATE [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]WO9838283 (UNIV GUELPH [CA], et al) [X] 1-48 * page 11, line 9 - line 14 *; | [X]WO9919472 (UNIV GEORGIA RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1-48 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 4 * * page 9, line 23 - page 11, line 13 *; | [A]WO0184920 (ADVANCED CELL TECH INC [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [X] - TOBA M ET AL, "Introduction of DT40 cells into chick embryos.", ASIAN JOURNAL OF ANDROLOGY. CHINA MAR 2001, (200103), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 49 - 53, XP002208512 [X] 1-48 * the whole document * | [DA] - PAIN B ET AL, "CHICKEN EMBRYONIC STEM CELLS AND TRANSGENIC STRATEGIES", CELLS TISSUES ORGANS, KARGER, BASEL, CH, (1999), vol. 165, ISSN 1422-6405, pages 212 - 219, XP000882175 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000016701 | [A] - ZAJCHOWSKI LAURA D ET AL, "Transgenic chickens: Past, present, and future.", AVIAN AND POULTRY BIOLOGY REVIEWS, (2000), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 1470-2061, pages 63 - 80, XP001100013 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - PRELLE K ET AL, "ESTABLISHMENT OF PLURIPOTENT CELL LINES FROM VERTEBRATE SPECIES - PRESENT STATUS AND FUTURE PROSPECTS", CELLS TISSUES ORGANS, KARGER, BASEL, CH, (1999), vol. 165, no. 3/4, ISSN 1422-6405, pages 220 - 236, XP000914313 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000016683 | Examination | - Abstract available at: http://www.poultryscience.org/pba/1952-2003/2001/2001%20Christman.pdf Retrieved: Oct. 3rd, 2007 50th Annual National Breeders Roundtable, St Louis, Missouri, May 3-4, 2001. Speaker: Dr Leandro Christmann: "Development of nuclear transfer (cloning) technology in avian species". |