EP1443908 - NANOSTRUCTURED COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/33] | NONOSTRUCTURED COMPOSITIONS | ||
[2014/02] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NANOPHASE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION 1319 Marquette Drive Romeoville, IL 60446 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Nanophase Technologies Corporation 1319 Marquette Drive Romeoville, IL 60446 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAYTON, Roger, H. 856 South Wright Street Naperville, IL 60540 / US | 02 /
BROTZMAN, Richard, W., Jr. 318 Kent Court Naperville, IL 60540-5711 / US | [2005/09] |
Former [2004/33] | 01 /
CAYTON, Roger, H. 856 South Wright Street Naperville, IL 60540 / US | ||
02 /
BROTZMAN, Richard, W., Jr. 318 Kent Court Naperville, IL 60540-5711 / US | |||
03 /
BILICKI, Dan 2446 Westbranch Court Naperville, IL 60565 / US | |||
04 /
FREED, Don 1034 Pleasant Street Oak Park, IL 60302 / US | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | MacLean, Martin Robert, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/33] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 02797062.3 | 04.11.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002US35295 | Priority number, date | US20010338887P | 03.11.2001 Original published format: US 338887 P | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03040223 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1443908 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/70, C08K3/20 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/08 (EP,US);
C08K2201/011 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/33] | A61K9/14, A61K9/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NONOSTRUKTUR-VERBINDUNGEN | [2004/33] | English: | NANOSTRUCTURED COMPOSITIONS | [2014/02] | French: | COMPOSITIONS NANOSTRUCTUREES | [2004/33] |
Former [2004/33] | NONOSTRUCTURED COMPOSITIONS | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 03.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9309169 (PQ CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,11,14 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0699964 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,11,14 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]US6228904 (YADAV TAPESH [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-13,17* claim 1 * | International search | [A]US5069945 (WRASIDLO WOLFGANG J [US]); | [A]US5573783 (DESIENO MARK A [US], et al) | Examination | - BOWEN P, "Particle Size Distribution Measurement from Millimeters to Nanometers and from Rods to Platelets", JOURNAL OF DISPERSION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, TAYLOR AND FRANCIS GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020101), vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.1081/DIS-120015368, ISSN 0193-2691, pages 631 - 662, XP009102859 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/DIS-120015368 |