EP1467671 - APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING SURGERY ON A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/43] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING SURGERY ON A PATIENT | ||
[2012/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [2012/30] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'NEILL, William, G. 16631 78th Avenue North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 02 /
STEELE, William 4255 Dawes Court Southeast Kentwood, MI 49508 / US | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/43] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02797213.2 | 10.12.2002 | [2004/43] | WO2002US39120 | Priority number, date | US20010017095 | 14.12.2001 Original published format: US 17095 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03051218 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467671 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1467671 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP,US);
A61B34/70 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00539 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON CHIRURGIE AN EINEM PATIENTEN | [2012/06] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PERFORMING SURGERY ON A PATIENT | [2012/06] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE PRATIQUER UNE INTERVENTION CHIRURGICALE SUR UN PATIENT | [2012/06] |
Former [2004/43] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON CHIRURGIE AN EINEM PATIENTEN | ||
Former [2004/43] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING SURGERY ON A PATIENT | ||
Former [2004/43] | APPAREIL ET METHODE PERMETTANT DE PRATIQUER UNE INTERVENTION CHIRURGICALE SUR UN PATIENT | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2012 | BE | 25.07.2012 | CY | 25.07.2012 | CZ | 25.07.2012 | DK | 25.07.2012 | EE | 25.07.2012 | FI | 25.07.2012 | IT | 25.07.2012 | NL | 25.07.2012 | SE | 25.07.2012 | SI | 25.07.2012 | SK | 25.07.2012 | TR | 25.07.2012 | BG | 25.10.2012 | GR | 26.10.2012 | ES | 05.11.2012 | PT | 26.11.2012 | GB | 10.12.2012 | IE | 10.12.2012 | LU | 10.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
GB | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 10.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
GB | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 10.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 10.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 10.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 10.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
IT | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5575799 (BOLANOS HENRY [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-14,27 * abstract * * column 7, lines 1-60 *; | [X]US5361583 (HUITEMA THOMAS W [US]) [X] 1-4,10-14,27 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0646356 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1,2,11-14,27 * abstract * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 25 * * column 10, line 56 - column 11, line 5 * * column 13, lines 43-47 * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]US4721099 (CHIKAMA TOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,11-14,27 * abstract * [Y] 8,9; | [A]US4950273 (BRIGGS JEFFREY M [US]) [A] 15-17 * abstract * | by applicant | GB2135737 | US5575799 | WO0207608 |