|
19.05.2010 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.06.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2006 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2006 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
01.03.2005 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2005 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.2005 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2005 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.12.2004 |
Request for correction of obvious mistakes allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2004 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.05.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.05.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
03.05.2004 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/429 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.04.2004 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2003 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/405 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Fax filed during the PCT2 procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
27.08.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.08.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.08.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |