Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7980536 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2011 | B2 | US2006279028 | 14.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35772402 | 15.02.2002 | US12874402 | 22.04.2002 | US50842206 | 23.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100939386B | Global Dossier | 28.01.2010 | B1 | KR20040091035 | 27.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR0240896 | 19.12.2002 | US35772402 | 15.02.2002 | US12874402 | 22.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4116570B | Global Dossier | 09.07.2008 | B2 | JP2005517529 | 16.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US35772402 | 15.02.2002 | US0240896 | 19.12.2002 | US12874402 | 22.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002361819 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2003 | A8 | AU2002361819 | 09.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35772402 | 15.02.2002 | US0240896 | 19.12.2002 | US12874402 | 22.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1474248 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2009 | B1 | EP1474248 | 10.11.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US35772402 | 15.02.2002 | US0240896 | 19.12.2002 | US12874402 | 22.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0215556 | 09.03.2011 | B1 | BR0215556 | 21.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US35772402 | 15.02.2002 | US0240896 | 19.12.2002 | US12874402 | 22.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60232998D1 | 27.08.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US35772402 | 15.02.2002 | US0240896 | 19.12.2002 | US12874402 | 22.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04007769 | 15.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US35772402 | 15.02.2002 | US0240896 | 19.12.2002 | US12874402 | 22.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03070387 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2003 | A3 | WO03070387 | 28.08.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US35772402 | 15.02.2002 | US12874402 | 22.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100408205C | 06.08.2008 | C | CN1620343 | 25.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US35772402 | 15.02.2002 | US12874402 | 22.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7243894 | 17.07.2007 | B2 | US2003155403 | 21.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35772402 | 15.02.2002 | US12874402 | 22.04.2002 |