EP1474248 - MOUNT FOR VIBRATORY ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAREGOPPA, Gopal P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
NAYAR, Satinder, K. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
OBLAK, Donald, S. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
GERDES, Ronald, W. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/46] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02797452.6 | 19.12.2002 | [2004/46] | WO2002US40896 | Priority number, date | US20020357724P | 15.02.2002 Original published format: US 357724 P | US20020128744 | 22.04.2002 Original published format: US 128744 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03070387 | Date: | 28.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1474248 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1474248 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B06B3/00, B23K20/10, B29C65/08 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
B06B3/00 (EP,KR,US);
B23K20/10 (KR);
B29C65/085 (EP,US);
B29C65/087 (EP,US);
B29C66/816 (EP);
B29C66/83411 (EP,US);
B29C66/83417 (EP,US);
B29C66/40 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/92611 (EP,US);
B29C66/929 (EP,US);
B29C66/9513 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNG FÜR SCHWINGELEMENTE | [2004/46] | English: | MOUNT FOR VIBRATORY ELEMENTS | [2004/46] | French: | SUPPORT POUR ELEMENTS VIBRATOIRES | [2004/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 16.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Request for further processing for: | 26.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 26.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.08.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.07.2009 | BE | 15.07.2009 | CY | 15.07.2009 | CZ | 15.07.2009 | DK | 15.07.2009 | EE | 15.07.2009 | FI | 15.07.2009 | IT | 15.07.2009 | NL | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | SI | 15.07.2009 | SK | 15.07.2009 | TR | 15.07.2009 | BG | 15.10.2009 | GR | 16.10.2009 | ES | 26.10.2009 | PT | 15.11.2009 | GB | 19.12.2009 | IE | 19.12.2009 | LU | 19.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | FR | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
GB | 19.12.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
LU | 19.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
GB | 19.12.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
GB | 19.12.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
IE | 19.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3292838 (FARLEY VINCENT P) [X] 1,2,8-13,15,22-27 * column 2, line 37 - line 48; figure 6 * * column 5, line 14 - line 16 *; | [A]US5590866 (CUNNINGHAM PATRICK M [US]) [A] 14,31* column 5, line 63 - line 67; figure 5 *; | [AX]US5976316 (MLINAR JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 3-6,13,16-20,28-30 * column 4, line 10 - column 5, line 51 * * column 5, line 21 - line 51 * [X] 13,21,25,26; | [X]WO0153032 (HESSE & KNIPPS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 17; figure 1 *; | [E]WO03051535 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [E] 1,6-8,10-13,21,22,24-30 * page 9, line 4 - page 10, line 12 * * page 19, line 17 - line 26 * * page 23, line 13 - line 19 * * page 25, line 29 - line 31 * | Examination | US3350582 | US3797901 |