EP1499185 - ENHANCED HERBICIDE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valent Biosciences, Corp. 870 Technology Way Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Valent Biosciences, Corp. 870 Technology Way Libertyville Illinois 60048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERMAN, F. Paul 461 Burton Avenue Highland Park, IL 60035 / US | 02 /
PETRACEK, Peter, D. 1387 London Court Grayslake, IL 60030 / US | 03 /
JU, Zhiguo 34407 Tangueray Drive Grayslake, IL 60030 / US | 04 /
HEIMAN; Daniel, F. 407 Drake Street Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 05 /
WARRIOR, Prem 14584 North Somerset Circle Green Oaks, IL 60048 / US | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/04] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02797463.3 | 19.12.2002 | [2005/04] | WO2002US41045 | Priority number, date | US20020369926P | 04.04.2002 Original published format: US 369926 P | US20020407456P | 30.08.2002 Original published format: US 407456 P | US20020421715P | 28.10.2002 Original published format: US 421715 P | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03084325 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1499185 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/32 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
A01N25/32 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,KR,US);
A01N27/00 (EP,US);
A01N37/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/80 (EP,US);
A01N43/82 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A01N57/00 (KR);
A01N57/20 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N43/40, A01N2300/00 (US);
A01N43/40, A01N61/00, A01N57/20, A01N43/82, A01N37/46, A01N37/40, A01N25/32 (US);
A01N43/40, A01N61/00, A01N63/30, A01N63/50, A01N63/20, A01N43/82, A01N43/80, A01N37/40, A01N27/00, A01N25/32 (US,EP);
A01N43/90, A01N2300/00 (US);
A01N43/90, A01N61/00, A01N63/30, A01N63/50, A01N63/20, A01N43/82, A01N43/80, A01N37/40, A01N27/00, A01N25/32 (US,EP);
A01N61/00, A01N2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE HERBIZIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2005/04] | English: | ENHANCED HERBICIDE COMPOSITION | [2005/04] | French: | COMPOSITION HERBICIDE AMELIOREE | [2005/04] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/01] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2005 | 31.12.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN1073803C ; | [X]US4203253 (BROOMFIELD JUNIOR [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11 * abstract * * column 4, line 20 - line 24 * * example - *; | [A]US6281168 (SHANER DALE LESTER [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 24 - line 30 ** example - *; | [X] - "Aqueous agent of ethephon and paraquat", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 10, Database accession no. 2000-117422, XP002333204 & CN1073803C C 20011031 (JIANGYIN AGRIC CHEM NO 2 PLANT CO) [X] 1-5,11 * abstract * | [X] - HOLE, C.C.; HARDWICK, R.C., "Chemical aids to drying seeds of beans (Phaseolus vulgaris) before harvest", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1978), Database accession no. 89:141755, URL: STN, XP002333202 [X] 1-3,11 * column A * | [X] - SALINAS, R.; GARCIDUENAS, M. ROJAS, "Chemical regulation of the plants and fruits in sesame (Sesamum indicum L.)", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1982), Database accession no. 96:137860, URL: STN, XP002333203 [X] 1-3,11 * column A * | [ ] - ANNALS OF APPLIED BIOLOGY, (1978), vol. 88, no. 3, pages 421 - 427 | [ ] - TURRIALBA, (1981), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 263 - 267 | International search | [Y]US2002035738 (THOMMA BART PIERRE HELENE JOSE [BE], et al); | [Y] - NIAES, "Topic 2: Resistance induction of a non-fungitoxic compound acibenzolar-S-methyl to cucumber and Japanese per disease", DIVISION OF PESTICIDES, ANNUAL REPORT, (1997), URL: www.niaes.affrc.90.jp, XP002968125 | [Y] - VAN TOOR ET AL., "Evaluation of acibenzolar-S-methyl for induction of resistance in Camellia flowers to Ciborninia Camelliac infection", NEW ZEALAND PLANT PROTECTION, (2001), vol. 54, pages 209 - 212, XP002968126 | [Y] - "Harpin Protein (006477)", US EPA FACT SHEET, (20020331), URL: www.epa.gov, XP002968127 | by applicant | US6281168 | - ENYEDI ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 70, pages 879 - 886 |