Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1425584
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.07.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
11.03.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.09.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.09.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.11.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
03.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.11.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.07.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.07.2008 |
First examination report |
|
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
01.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.11.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
02.11.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
01.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
23.04.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
13.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|