EP1423387 - PHOTOCHROMIC BIS-NAPHTHOPYRAN COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE) 147, Rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | ||
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE) 147 rue de Paris 94220 Charenton le Pont / FR | ||
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway, Suite 100 Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Weili Hirzenbachstrasse 77/8 CH-8051 Zurich / CH | 02 /
CARRIERA, Erik, M. Chapfstrasse 73 CH-8124 Zumikon / CH | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Perin, Georges Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Perin, Georges Cabinet Plasseraud, 65/67, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 9 / FR | ||
Former [2004/23] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02797735.4 | 13.08.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002US25669 | Priority number, date | US20010945897 | 04.09.2001 Original published format: US 945897 | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03020718 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423387 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1423387 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/04, G02B5/23, C09K9/00 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
C07D409/14 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/23] | C07D409/04, G02B5/23 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2009/47] |
Former [2004/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOCHROME BIS-NAPHTOPYRANVERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2004/23] | English: | PHOTOCHROMIC BIS-NAPHTHOPYRAN COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR THEIR MANUFACTURE | [2004/23] | French: | COMPOSES PHOTOCHROMES DE BIS-NAPHTHOPYRAN ET LEUR PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.03.2010 | IE | 13.08.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/14] | IT | 17.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9601884 (RODENSTOCK OPTIK G [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * Claims 1-4; p. 2, l. 23-29; p. 3, l. 22-27; ex. 2,4,6 *; | [A]US6281366 (FRIGOLI MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * Claims 1-15; Formula (I); col. 6, l. 65-col. 7, l. 20; ex. 7 *; | [PX] - YASSAR, A. ET AL, "Molecular switch devices realized by photochromic oligothiophenes", SYNTHETIC METALS, (2001), vol. 124, no. 1, pages 23 - 27, XP002219612 [PX] 1-11 * Compounds V and IX * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0379-6779(01)00414-3 | [PX] - ZHAO, WEILI ET AL, "A smart photochromophore through synergistic coupling of photochromic subunits", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2002), vol. 124, no. 8, pages 1582 - 1583, XP002219613 [PX] 1-11 * Compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja017291b | [Y] - MOUSTROU ET AL, "Synthesis of thiophene-substituted 3H-naphtho[2,1-b]pyrans, precursors of photomodulated materials", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA. BASEL, CH, (1998), vol. 81, no. 7, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 1293 - 1302, XP002132847 [Y] 1-11 * Compound 16; p. 1296, l. 28-p. 1297, l. 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19980810540 | [A] - SAMAT A ET AL, "Synthesis and unexpected photochemical behaviour of biphotochromic systems involving spirooxazines and naphthopyrans linked by an ethylenic bridge", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010820), vol. 57, no. 34, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 7349 - 7359, XP004301019 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)00693-7 |