EP1417753 - AUTO-ZEROED PING-PONG AMPLIFIER WITH LOW TRANSIENT SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Technology Way Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Technology Way, P.O. Box 9106 Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | ||
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states ANALOG DEVICES, INCORPORATED One Technology Way, P.O. Box 9106 Norwood, MA 02602-9106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Andrew, T., K. 3615 Ethan Court San Jose, CA 95136 / US | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2004/20] | Butcher, Ian James, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02797821.2 | 29.08.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002US27825 | Priority number, date | US20010946709 | 04.09.2001 Original published format: US 946709 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03021771 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1417753 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1417753 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/45, H03F3/343 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H03F3/45941 (EP,US);
H03F3/45977 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/37] |
Former [2004/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PINGPONGVERSTÄRKER MIT AUTOMATISCHER NULLSTELLUNG UND TRANSIENTENARMER UMSCHALTUNG | [2004/20] | English: | AUTO-ZEROED PING-PONG AMPLIFIER WITH LOW TRANSIENT SWITCHING | [2004/20] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR A FONCTIONNEMENT EN BASCULE AUTO-ZERO AVEC COMMUTATION A FAIBLES PHENOMENES TRANSITOIRES | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 14.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0426594 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-22 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 33; figures 2,3 * | [A] - OPRIS I E ET AL, A RAIL-TO-RAIL PING-PONG OF-AMP, IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, VOL. 31, NR. 9, PAGE(S) 1320-1324, ISSN 0018-9200, XP000638074 [A] 1-22 * page 1320, paragraph 1 - page 1321, paragraph 3; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.535417 | [A] - BAKKER A ET AL, OFFSET REDUCTION IN CURRENT-MODE MICROSYSTEMS, 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ISCAS). CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS CONNECTING THE WORLD. ATLANTA, MAY 12 - 15, 1996, IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ISCAS), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, VOL. VOL. 4, PAGE(S) 344-347, ISBN 0-7803-3074-9, XP000704607 [A] 1-22 * page 344, paragraph 1 - page 345, paragraph 2.1; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1996.541972 |