EP1425206 - ASSEMBLY CONSISTING OF A STEERING WHEEL AND A TORSION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG Wiesenstrasse 47 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2004/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONNER, Harald Oesterfeld 6 58540 Meinerzhagen / DE | [2004/24] | Application number, filing date | 02797972.3 | 10.09.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002EP10105 | Priority number, date | DE2001144549 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10144549 | [2004/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03022658 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425206 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425206 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/10 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
B62D6/10 (EP);
B62D1/10 (EP);
G01L3/1428 (EP);
G01L5/221 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG BESTEHEND AUS EINEM LENKRAD UND EINEM TORSIONSMODUL | [2004/24] | English: | ASSEMBLY CONSISTING OF A STEERING WHEEL AND A TORSION MODULE | [2004/24] | French: | ENSEMBLE COMPOSE D'UN VOLANT ET D'UN MODULE DE TORSION | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 09.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.07.2005 | IE | 27.07.2005 | NL | 27.07.2005 | AT | 10.09.2005 | CY | 10.09.2005 | BE | 30.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | DK | 27.10.2005 | GR | 27.10.2005 | SE | 27.10.2005 | PT | 27.12.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/11] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
AT | 10.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
AT | 10.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
DK | 27.10.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
IE | 27.07.2005 | ||
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
NL | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.10.2005 | ||
SE | 27.10.2005 | ||
PT | 27.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 27.07.2005 | |
SE | 27.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0879752 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE SAFETY SYS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 3 - column 2, line 38 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 57 *; | [A]US5855451 (MILTON THOMAS JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,3,6,9* abstract *; | [A]US5884936 (MATSU RICHARD L [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 58 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 18 * |