Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | Lapse: 30.09.2008 | BG | Lapse: 27.05.2008 | CH | | CY | Lapse: 27.02.2008 | CZ | Lapse: 27.02.2008 | DE | | DK | Lapse: 27.02.2008 | EE | Lapse: 27.02.2008 | ES | Lapse: 07.06.2008 | FI | Lapse: 27.02.2008 | FR | | GB | | GR | Lapse: 28.05.2008 | IE | Lapse: 27.02.2008 | IT | Lapse: 27.02.2008 | LI | | LU | Lapse: 11.09.2008 | MC | Lapse: 30.09.2008 | NL | | PT | Lapse: 21.07.2008 | SE | Lapse: 27.05.2008 | SK | Lapse: 27.02.2008 | TR | Lapse: 27.02.2008 | Examination procedure | 04.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | | 12.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 12.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | European patent granted | 27.02.2008 | Opposition procedure | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 09.06.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20040312 | | Event date: | 09.06.2004 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR | | Event date: | 09.06.2004 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK RO SI | | Event date: | 25.08.2004 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | SOLVENT INNOVATION GMBH | | Event date: | 30.08.2006 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20060731 | | Event date: | 27.02.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR | | Event date: | 27.02.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Event date: | 31.03.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 02.04.2008 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MERCK PATENT GMBH | | Event date: | 10.04.2008 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 50211793 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20080410 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 02.04.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN | | Event date: | 30.04.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | BOHEST AG | | Event date: | 02.06.2008 | | Event description: | NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN | OWNER: | MERCK PATENT GMBH | Effective DATE: | 20080402 | | Event date: | 31.07.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080607 | | Event date: | 31.07.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080227 | | Event date: | 28.05.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | | Event date: | 01.10.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FD4D | Code Expl.: | -EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080227 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080227 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080227 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080721 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080527 | | Event date: | 31.10.2008 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080227 | | Event date: | 21.11.2008 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 24.12.2008 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | BASF SE | Effective DATE: | 20081112 | | Event date: | 02.03.2009 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | BASF SE | | Event date: | 30.04.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080527 | | Event date: | 30.04.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080227 | | Event date: | 30.04.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080930 | | Event date: | 31.07.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080930 | | Event date: | 31.07.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080227 | | Event date: | 31.08.2009 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080227 | | Event date: | 31.03.2009 | | Event description: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | SOLVENT INNOVATION G.M.B.H. | Effective DATE: | 20080930 | | Event date: | 30.07.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080911 | | Event date: | 31.08.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080227 | | Event date: | 29.10.2010 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080528 | | Event date: | 16.03.2011 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Effective DATE: | 20110316 | | Event date: | 16.03.2011 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR | | Event date: | 31.03.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH AEN | Code Expl.: | SCOPE OR VALIDITY OF THE PATENT MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM | | Event date: | 04.05.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 15.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PCAR | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE | Free Format Text: | NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH) | | Event date: | 19.05.2011 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R102 50211793 DE | Code Expl.: | EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL | Effective DATE: | 20110316 | | Event date: | 29.06.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 16.08.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Event date: | 10.08.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 13.08.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.10.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20180828 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.10.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20180813 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 31.10.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20180815 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 30.11.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20180905 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 30.11.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20180828 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 30.11.2018 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20180913 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 06.05.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20191001 | | Event date: | 01.04.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 50211793 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Event date: | 29.05.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 31.07.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190930 | | Event date: | 31.07.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190930 | | Event date: | 31.07.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200401 | | Event date: | 31.07.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20191001 | | Event date: | 15.08.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MM01 387427 AT T | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190911 | | Event date: | 02.09.2020 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20190911 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190930 | | Event date: | 30.10.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190911 | | Event date: | 30.11.2020 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20190911 | | Event date: | 11.02.2011 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009272 | | Event date: | 25.01.2008 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 15.01.2008 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 18.09.2007 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 23.04.2004 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 11.02.2011 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT MAINTAINED AS AMENDED | | Event date: | 25.05.2009 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 09.01.2009 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 21.11.2008 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | |