EP1425214 - TORPEDO LAUNCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRACHAN & HENSHAW LIMITED Ashton House P.O. Box 103 Ashton Vale Road Bristol Somerset BS99 7TJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states STRACHAN & HENSHAW LIMITED Ashton House P.O. Box 103 Ashton Vale Road Bristol Somerset BS99 7TJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWEN, Bryan, Jeffrey Llwyn Onn 42 Green Pastures Road Wraxall Somerset BS49 1ND / GB | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02798009.3 | 10.09.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002GB04108 | Priority number, date | GB20010021839 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: GB 0121839 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03022675 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1425214 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1425214 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B63G8/32, F41F3/10 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
B63G8/32 (EP,KR,US);
F41F3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/51] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TORPEDOSTARTSYSTEM | [2004/24] | English: | TORPEDO LAUNCH SYSTEM | [2004/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE LANCE-TORPILLES | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 20.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6220196 (ESCARRAT PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US2837971 (ROBERT WOSAK) [A] 1-5 * column 2, lines 11-27 * * column 4, line 12 - column 8, line 63; figure - * |