EP1456602 - SENSOR FOR THE VISUAL POSITION DETECTION (COMPONENT, SUBSTRATE) COMPRISING A MODULAR LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Werner Adolf-Kolping-Str. 33 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [2004/38] | Application number, filing date | 02798277.6 | 13.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002DE04574 | Priority number, date | DE2001162270 | 18.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10162270 | [2004/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03052346 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1456602 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1456602 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/00, H05K13/08 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
H05K13/0812 (EP,US);
H05K13/08 (KR);
G01N21/956 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Title | German: | SENSOR ZUR VISUELLEN POSITIONSERFASSUNG ( BAUELEMENT, SUBSTRAT ) MIT EINER MODULAREN BELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT | [2004/38] | English: | SENSOR FOR THE VISUAL POSITION DETECTION (COMPONENT, SUBSTRATE) COMPRISING A MODULAR LIGHTING DEVICE | [2004/38] | French: | CAPTEUR DE DETECTION VISUELLE DE POSITION (COMPOSANT, SUBSTRAT) DOTE D'UNE UNITE D'ECLAIRAGE MODULAIRE | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 16.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 31.08.2005 | EE | 31.08.2005 | FI | 31.08.2005 | IE | 31.08.2005 | SI | 31.08.2005 | SK | 31.08.2005 | TR | 31.08.2005 | BG | 30.11.2005 | DK | 30.11.2005 | GR | 30.11.2005 | SE | 30.11.2005 | ES | 12.12.2005 | AT | 13.12.2005 | CY | 13.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | PT | 23.02.2006 | [2007/28] |
Former [2007/20] | CZ | 31.08.2005 | |
EE | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
IE | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
TR | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
CY | 13.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 31.08.2005 | |
EE | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
IE | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
TR | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | CZ | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
IE | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
TR | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
IE | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | CZ | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
IE | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SK | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | CZ | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
IE | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 31.08.2005 | |
IE | 31.08.2005 | ||
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
PT | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 31.08.2005 | |
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 12.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 31.08.2005 | |
SI | 31.08.2005 | ||
BG | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0634892 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,11,12 * column 4, line 30 - line 34; figure 2 *; | [A]DE29607417U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] * page 3, line 28 - line 30; figure 2 *; | [A]JPH08219716 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] * figure 16 * |