EP1499723 - NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuvelo, Inc. 675 Almanor Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2005/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Y., Tom 4230 Ranwick Court San Jose, CA 95118 / US | 02 /
ASUNDI, Vinod 709 Foster City Boulevard Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
GOODRICH, Ryle, W. 3461 Saint Susan Place Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | 04 /
REN, Feiyan 7703 Oak Meadow Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Jie 4930 Poplar Terrace Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 06 /
ZHAO, Qing, A. 1556 Kooser Rd San Jose, CA 95118 / US | 07 /
WANG, Jian-Rui 744 Stendhal Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 08 /
GHOSH, Malabika 620 Iris Avenue, Apt. 133 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 09 /
XUE, Aidong, J. 1621 S. Mary Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 10 /
WEHRMAN, Tom CCSR Mol Pharm 3210 269 W. Campus Dr Stanford, CA 94305 / US | 11 /
WENG, Gezhi 415 Moraga Avenue Piedmont, CA 94611 / US | 12 /
ZHOU, Ping 7595 Newcastle Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 13 /
DRMANAC, Radoje, T. 850 East Greenwich Place Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 14 /
WANG, Dunrui 12252 Pepper Tree Lane Poway, CA 92064 / US | 15 /
HALEY-VICENTE, Dana 1305 Eagle Glen Escondido, CA 92029 / US | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/04] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Boeters & Lieck, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02799009.2 | 19.09.2002 | [2005/04] | WO2002US29964 | Priority number, date | US20010323739P | 19.09.2001 Original published format: US 323739 P | US20020245014 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: US 245014 | [2005/37] |
Former [2005/04] | US20010323739P | 19.09.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03025148 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1499723 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/11, C12N15/00, C12N15/64, C12N15/79, C12Q1/68, C12P21/02 | [2005/04] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE NUKLEINSÄUREN UND POLYPEPTIDE | [2005/04] | English: | NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES | [2005/04] | French: | NOUVEAUX ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET POLYPEPTIDES | [2005/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 15.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9855613 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * see the whole document; protein with SEQ ID NO: 3 has 95.3% identity with SEQ ID NO: 277 *; | [X]US5998372 (HILLMAN JENNIFER L [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * see the whole document *; | WO0055174 [ ] (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [X] - "Human prostate cancer antigen protein sequence SEQ ID NO:1231.", Geneseq, (20010313), Database accession no. AAB56653, URL: EBI, XP002330031 [X] 1-10 * The sequence is 100% identical with SEQ ID NO: 277 * | [X] - "Homo sapiens RING zinc finger protein (RZF) mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (19980109), Database accession no. AF037204, URL: EBI, XP002330032 [X] 1-10 * The sequence is 99.9% identical with SEQ ID NO: 1 * | International search | [A]WO9946289 |