EP1461758 - CRYSTAL STRUCTURE OF MITOGEN-ACTIVATED PROTEIN KINASE-ACTIVATED PROTEIN KINASE 2 AND BINDING POCKETS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139-4242 / US | [2004/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENG, Wuyi 19 Crestview Drive Westborough, MA 01581 / US | 02 /
SWENSON, Lovorka 5 Davis Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/40] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02799215.5 | 05.12.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002US39070 | Priority number, date | US20010337513P | 05.12.2001 Original published format: US 337513 P | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03048340 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1461758 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06G7/48, G06G7/58, G01N33/48, G01N33/50, A61K39/00 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
C12Q1/485 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (EP,US);
G16B15/30 (EP,US);
C07K2299/00 (EP,US);
G16B15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRISTALLSTRUKTUR EINES MITOGENAKTIVIERTEN PROTEINS, KINASE-AKTIVIERTES PROTEIN, KINASE-2 UND BINDE-POCKETS DAFÜR | [2004/40] | English: | CRYSTAL STRUCTURE OF MITOGEN-ACTIVATED PROTEIN KINASE-ACTIVATED PROTEIN KINASE 2 AND BINDING POCKETS THEREOF | [2004/40] | French: | STRUCTURE CRISTALLINE DE PROTEINE KINASE 2 ACTIVEE PAR LA PROTEINE KINASE ACTIVEE PAR DES AGENTS MITOGENES ET POCHES DE FIXATION | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 16.11.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO02090524 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - WILSON K P ET AL, "Crystal structure of p38 mitogen-activated protein kinase.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. 1 NOV 1996, (19961101), vol. 271, no. 44, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 27696 - 27700, XP002339160 [A] 1-16,20-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.44.27696 | [A] - GSCHWEND D A ET AL, "MOLECULAR DOCKING TOWARDS DRUG DISCOVERY", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR RECOGNITION, HEYDEN & SON LTD., LONDON, GB, (1996), vol. 9, ISSN 0952-3499, pages 175 - 186, XP000882526 [A] 1-16,20-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-1352(199603)9:2<175::AID-JMR260>3.0.CO;2-D | International search | [XP] - MENG W.M. ET AL., "Structure of mitogen-activated protein kinase-activated protein (MAPKAP) kinase 2 suggests a bifunctional switch that couples kinase activation with nuclear export", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (200210), vol. 277, no. 40, pages 37401 - 37405, XP002965434 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.C200418200 | [XP] - "Crystal structure of mapkap2", PROTEIN DATA BANK RECORD, (20020918), URL: http://www.rcsb.org/pdb/., XP002965438 | [Y] - HOLLAND P.M. ET AL., "Protein modification: docking sites for kinases", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 9, pages R329 - R331, XP002965435 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(99)80205-X | [Y] - ENGEL K. ET AL., "Constitutive activation of mitogen-activated protein kinase-activated protein kinase 2 by mutation of phosphorylation sites and an A-helix motif", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (199511), vol. 270, no. 45, pages 27213 - 27221, XP002226892 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.40.23790 | [Y] - ZU Y.-L. ET AL., "Characterization of an autoinhibitory domain in human mitogen activated protein kinase activated protein kinase 2", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (199501), vol. 270, no. 1, pages 202 - 206, XP002965436 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.1.202 | [Y] - PEARSON G. ET AL., "Mitogen activated protein (MAP) kinase pathways: regulation and physiological functions", ENDOCRINE REVIEWS, (2001), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 153 - 183, XP002235969 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/er.22.2.153 | [A] - NEW L. ET AL., "The p38 map kinase pathway and its biological function", TRENDS IN CARDIOVASCULAR MEDICINE, (199807), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 220 - 228, XP002965437 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1050-1738(98)00012-7 |