EP1465617 - PROCESS FOR AFFECTING NEUROLOGIC PROGRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHARMACYCLICS, INC. 995 East Arques Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085-4521 / US | [2004/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Richard, A. 250 Golden Hills Drive Portola Valley, CA 94028 / US | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02799240.3 | 12.12.2002 | [2004/42] | WO2002US39974 | Priority number, date | US20010339650P | 13.12.2001 Original published format: US 339650 P | US20020346584P | 07.01.2002 Original published format: US 346584 P | US20020353090P | 30.01.2002 Original published format: US 353090 P | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03049731 | Date: | 19.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1465617 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1465617 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/33, A61P25/00 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
A61K31/555 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/33 (KR);
A61K47/546 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/42] | A61K31/33 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Extension states | AL | 09.07.2004 | LT | 09.07.2004 | LV | 09.07.2004 | MK | 09.07.2004 | RO | 09.07.2004 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEEINFLUSSUNG NEUROLOGISCHER PROGRESSION | [2004/42] | English: | PROCESS FOR AFFECTING NEUROLOGIC PROGRESSION | [2004/42] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'AFFECTER LA PROGRESSION NEUROLOGIQUE | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.10.2008 | CZ | 15.10.2008 | EE | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | SI | 15.10.2008 | SK | 15.10.2008 | TR | 15.10.2008 | BG | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 15.10.2008 | |
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
TR | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 15.10.2008 | |
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 15.10.2008 | |
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 15.10.2008 | |
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | BG | 15.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA] - JULIETTE VIALA AND ALL., "Phase IB and II multidose trial of Gadolinium Texaphyrin, a radiation sensitizer detectable at MR imaging: preliminary results in brain metastases", RADIOLOGY, (1999), vol. 212, pages 755 - 759, XP002341426 [DA] * abstract * | [A] - DAVID I. ROSENTHAL AND ALL., "A phase I single-dose trial of Gadolinium Texaphyrin (Gd-Tex), a tumor selective radiation sensitizer detectable by magnetic resonance imaging", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (199904), vol. 5, pages 739 - 745, XP002341427 [A] * abstract * | [A] - ERIC J. BERNHARD AND ALL., "Re-evaluating Gadolinium(III) Texaphyrin as a radiosensitizing agent", CANCER RESEARCH, (200001), vol. 60, pages 86 - 91, XP002341428 [A] * abstract * | International search | [A]US5569759 (SESSLER JONATHAN L [US], et al) |