EP1461588 - SYMMETRICAL DEPOLARIZED FIBER OPTIC GYROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZAFRANIEC, Bogdan Apartment D, 1035 Castleton Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 95087 / US | 02 /
KALISZEK, Andrew 1156 East Beverly Lane Phoenix, AZ 85022 / US | 03 /
LANGE, Charles 4611 West Alameda Road Glendale, AZ 85310 / US | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2004/40] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02799251.0 | 16.12.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002US40251 | Priority number, date | US20020038131 | 03.01.2002 Original published format: US 38131 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03060427 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1461588 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/72, H01S3/067 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
G01C19/721 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | SYMMETRISCH DEPOLARISIERTES FASEROPTISCHES GYROSKOP | [2004/40] | English: | SYMMETRICAL DEPOLARIZED FIBER OPTIC GYROSCOPE | [2004/40] | French: | GYROSCOPE A FIBRES OPTIQUES DEPOLARISE ET SYMETRIQUE | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 21.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 10.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0039528 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8-18,21,23 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 37 * * page 5, line 17 - page 7, line 28; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,4,6,7,19,20,22; | [YA]WO9800682 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [Y] 3,4,6,7,19,20,22 * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 31; figure 1 * [A] 1,8,11; | [A]US5602642 (BERGH RALPH A [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 2, line 41 - line 65 * * column 9, line 60 - column 10, line 5; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]US5347354 (MUELLER REINHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 1, line 48 - column 4, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4223740 (TELDIX GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-23 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 41; figures 1-3 * | Examination | WO0036375 |