EP1458311 - VALVE MOUNTING ASSEMBLY FOR VOICE PROSTHESIS-CARTRIDGE AND RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Helix Medical, LLC 47690 East Anchor Court Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2007/18] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Helix Medical, Inc. 1110 Mark Avenue Carpinteria, California 93013 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEDER, Edmund, V. 500 Barker Pass Road Santa Barbara, CA 93108 / US | 02 /
PORTER, Tina 608 Eva Street Ventura, CA 93003 / US | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02799301.3 | 20.12.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002US41274 | Priority number, date | US20010344444P | 28.12.2001 Original published format: US 344444 P | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03057083 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1458311 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/20 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
A61F2/203 (EP,US);
A61M16/0468 (EP,US);
F16K15/031 (US);
F16K15/16 (US);
Y10T137/7891 (EP);
Y10T137/7898 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILBEFESTIGUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EINE STIMMPROTHESEN-KARTUSCHE UND RING | [2004/39] | English: | VALVE MOUNTING ASSEMBLY FOR VOICE PROSTHESIS-CARTRIDGE AND RING | [2004/39] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MONTAGE DE VALVE DESTINE A UNE CARTOUCHE DE PROTHESE VOCALE ET ANNEAU | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 18.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/24] | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5693097 (LAGUETTE STEPHEN W [US], et al) [Y] 14-19,21-23* column 4; figures 1-7 *; | [XY]WO9745075 (ATOS MEDICAL AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-6,9-13,20 [Y] 7,14-19,21-23; | [XY]US5957978 (BLOM ERIC D [US]) [X] 1-6,8 * column 3; figures 6,7,10 * [Y] 7 | International search | [A]US3952335 (SORCE PETER S, et al); | [A]US4610691 (DEPEL WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [X]US4911716 (BLOM ERIC D [US], et al); | [A]US5064433 (BLOM ERIC D [US], et al); | [Y]US5238749 (CUEMAN GLENN F [US], et al); | [A]US5314470 (PERSSON JAN-OVE [SE]); | [A]US5391205 (KNIGHT ROY F [US]); | [A]US5480432 (SUDING DAVID R [US], et al); | [A]US5578083 (LAGUETTE STEPHEN W [US], et al); | [Y]US5693097 (LAGUETTE STEPHEN W [US], et al); | [AP]US6358222 (GRUNDEI HANS [DE]); | [YE]US6558686 (DAROUICHE RABIH O [US]) |