EP1468466 - GROUPED ELEMENT TRANSMISSION CHANNEL LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2009 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNKER, David 407 Verbena Court Naperville, IL 60565 / US | 02 /
DAWIEDCZYK, Daniel, L. 2212 Periwinkle Lane Naperville, IL 60540 / US | 03 /
LOPATA, John, E. 325 Hemlock Lane Naperville, IL 60540 / US | 04 /
DUTTA, Arindum 31408 Village Green Boulevard Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Evans, Huw David Duncan, et al Chapman IP Kings Park House 22 Kings Park Road Southampton SO15 2AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Evans, Huw David Duncan, et al Chapman Molony Cardiff Business Technology Centre Senghennydd Road Cardiff CF24 4AY / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF24 0AA / GB | ||
Former [2004/43] | Evans, Huw David Duncan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF2 1AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02799350.0 | 30.12.2002 | [2004/43] | WO2002US41792 | Priority number, date | US20010344223P | 28.12.2001 Original published format: US 344223 P | US20020354581P | 05.02.2002 Original published format: US 354581 P | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03058750 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468466 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01P3/00 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
H05K1/024 (EP,US);
H01P3/02 (EP,US);
H01R13/658 (EP,US);
H05K3/107 (EP,US);
H05K3/403 (EP,US);
H01R12/716 (EP,US);
H01R12/79 (EP,US);
H05K1/0284 (EP,US);
H05K1/145 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09036 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09118 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09236 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09645 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09981 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10189 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10893 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSKANALSTRECKE MIT GRUPPIERTEN ELEMENTEN | [2004/43] | English: | GROUPED ELEMENT TRANSMISSION CHANNEL LINK | [2004/43] | French: | LIAISON DE VOIE DE TRANSMISSION D'ELEMENTS GROUPES | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 10.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/15] | 11.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19503666 (DILLNBERGER KARL DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1-57 * figure . * * abstract *; | [A]US5149915 (BRUNKER DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-57 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 19; figure . * |