EP1436581 - TOTAL AIR TEMPERATURE PROBE PROVIDING IMPROVED ANT-ICING PERFORMANCE AND REDUCED DEICING HEATER ERROR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC. 14300 Judicial Road Burnsville, MN 55306-4898 / US | [2004/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICE, Paul, A. 7219 131st Circle Apple Valley, MN 55124 / US | 02 /
WILLCOX, Charles, R. 16128 Baywood Lane Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Tucker, Nigel P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Tucker, Nigel P., et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02799565.3 | 05.09.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US28244 | Priority number, date | US20010960594 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: US 960594 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03027622 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436581 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1436581 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01K13/02 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
G01K13/028 (EP,US);
G01K13/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESAMTLUFTTEMPERATURSONDE MIT VERBESSERTER ANT-ICING-LEISTUNGSFÄHIGKEIT UND VERRINGERTEM ENTEISUNGSHEIZELEMENTFEHLER | [2004/29] | English: | TOTAL AIR TEMPERATURE PROBE PROVIDING IMPROVED ANT-ICING PERFORMANCE AND REDUCED DEICING HEATER ERROR | [2004/29] | French: | SONDE DE TEMPERATURE D'AIR DYNAMIQUE FOURNISSANT DES PERFORMANCES D'ANTIGIVRAGE AMELIOREES ET DES ERREURS DE RECHAUFFEUR DE DEGIVRAGE REDUITES | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 05.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.05.2007 | 02.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 27.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.02.2008 | CY | 20.02.2008 | CZ | 20.02.2008 | DK | 20.02.2008 | EE | 20.02.2008 | FI | 20.02.2008 | NL | 20.02.2008 | SK | 20.02.2008 | TR | 20.02.2008 | BG | 20.05.2008 | SE | 20.05.2008 | GR | 21.05.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | IE | 05.09.2008 | LU | 05.09.2008 | CH | 30.09.2008 | LI | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | BE | 20.02.2008 | |
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
TR | 20.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
LU | 05.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | BE | 20.02.2008 | |
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
LU | 05.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | BE | 20.02.2008 | |
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | BE | 20.02.2008 | |
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | BE | 20.02.2008 | |
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | BE | 20.02.2008 | |
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | BE | 20.02.2008 | |
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | BE | 20.02.2008 | |
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | BE | 20.02.2008 | |
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | BE | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 20.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9402814 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]WO0144821 (THALES AVIONICS SA [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-12 * abstract * |