EP1463874 - DEVICE FOR VARIABLY ACTUATING THE GAS EXCHANGE VALVES IN RECIPROCATING ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27 c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÖN, Helmut Amordonastrasse 12 A-6820 Frastanz / AT | 02 /
KUHN, Peter Prankelstrasse 61 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Pietruk, Claus Peter Patentanwalt Heinrich-Lilienfein-Weg 5 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Pietruk, Claus Peter, Dipl.-Phys. Heinrich-Lilienfein-Weg 5 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 02799714.7 | 19.12.2002 | [2004/41] | WO2002DE04681 | Priority number, date | DE20011064493 | 29.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10164493 | [2004/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03058039 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463874 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1463874 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/00 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
F01L13/0021 (EP,US);
F01L13/00 (KR);
F01L1/12 (KR);
F01L13/0063 (EP,US);
F01L2013/0068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VARIABLEN BETÄTIGUNG DER LADUNGSWECHSELVENTILE IN HUBKOLBENMOTOREN | [2004/41] | English: | DEVICE FOR VARIABLY ACTUATING THE GAS EXCHANGE VALVES IN RECIPROCATING ENGINES | [2004/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ACTIONNER DE MANIERE VARIABLE LES SOUPAPES DE CHANGEMENT DES GAZ DANS DES MOTEURS A PISTONS ALTERNATIFS | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 16.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.01.2008 | DK | 09.01.2008 | EE | 09.01.2008 | FI | 09.01.2008 | IE | 09.01.2008 | NL | 09.01.2008 | SI | 09.01.2008 | SK | 09.01.2008 | TR | 09.01.2008 | BG | 09.04.2008 | SE | 09.04.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | PT | 09.06.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 09.01.2008 | |
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 09.01.2008 | |
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 09.01.2008 | |
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | DK | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 09.01.2008 | |
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 09.01.2008 | |
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 09.01.2008 | |
SI | 09.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | SI | 09.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS60159319 ; | [A]DE2951361 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0717174 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19960742 (IAV GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851221), vol. 009, no. 326, Database accession no. (M - 441), & JP60159319 A 19850820 (SUZUKI JIDOSHA KOGYO KK) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | by applicant | DE2629554 | DE3833540 | DE4223172 | DE4322449 |