29.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
13.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
13.11.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
14.11.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
13.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
24.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
12.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
29.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
22.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
30.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
11.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
04.12.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.12.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.07.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
31.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
02.03.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
03.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.09.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
20.08.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
11.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|