EP1430102 - CATIONIC REACTIVE DYES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2008/21] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAM, Jean-Marie 60 D, rue de Village-Neuf F-68128 Rosenau / FR | 02 /
BACHER, Jean-Pierre 9, rue des Vergers F-68220 Buschwiller / FR | [2004/26] | Application number, filing date | 02800088.3 | 17.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002EP10404 | Priority number, date | CH20010001755 | 24.09.2001 Original published format: CH 17552001 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03029359 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1430102 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/04, C09B62/085, C09B44/16, A61K7/13 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
C09B62/046 (EP,US);
C09B62/04 (KR);
A61K8/4946 (EP,US);
A61K8/4966 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
C09B44/16 (EP,US);
C09B62/085 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATIONISCHE REAKTIONSFARBSTOFFE | [2004/26] | English: | CATIONIC REACTIVE DYES | [2004/26] | French: | COLORANTS REACTIFS CATIONIQUES | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 11.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3424320 (SANDOZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,8,12 * examples 1,2,4-6,12-15,17,40,44,47,54;; examples 55,59,60,64,67,70,73-79,A-D; claim - *; | [X]US3338660 (WALTER BIEDERMANN) [X] 1,8,12 * examples 71,83,93,94,129,146 *; | [X]GB1027570 (GEIGY AG J R) [X] 1,8,12 * examples 16,43,47,66 *; | [X]US5175259 (JESSEN JOERG L [DE], et al) [X] 1,8,12 * examples 20,68 *; | [AD]EP0714954 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [AD] 1-13 * example 3; claim - *; | [AD]WO9501772 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-13 * example -; claim - * | Examination | US3585182 |