EP1431004 - STAPLER, CARTRIDGE FOR STAPLER, AND SYSTEM HAVING THE STAPLER AND CARTRIDGE IN COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/26] | STAPLER, CARTRIDGE FOR STAPLER, AND SYSTEM HAVING THE STAPLER AND CARTRIDGE IN COMBINATION | ||
[2004/37] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Max Co., Ltd. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA, Takashi, c/o Max Co., Ltd. 6-6, Nihonbashihakozakicho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | 02 /
MAEMORI, Jun, c/o Max Co., Ltd. 6-6, Nihonbashihakozakicho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | 03 /
AOKI, Akira, c/o Max Co., Ltd. 6-6, Nihonbashihakozakicho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Turi, Michael, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Turi, Michael, Dipl.-Phys., et al Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02800253.3 | 26.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002JP09980 | Priority number, date | JP20010304565 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001304565 | [2004/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03028957 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431004 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1431004 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B25C5/16 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B25C5/1686 (EP,US);
B25C5/16 (KR);
B25C5/0242 (EP,US);
B25C5/0278 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEFTVORRICHTUNG, PATRONE FÜR HEFTVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM MIT EINER KOMBINATION AUS HEFTVORRICHTUNG UND PATRONE | [2004/26] | English: | STAPLER, CARTRIDGE FOR STAPLER, AND SYSTEM HAVING THE STAPLER AND CARTRIDGE IN COMBINATION | [2004/38] | French: | AGRAFEUSE, CARTOUCHE POUR AGRAFEUSE, ET SYSTEME DOTE DE L'AGRAFEUSE ET DE LA CARTOUCHE COMBINEES | [2004/26] |
Former [2004/26] | STAPLER, CARTRIDGE FOR STAPLER, AND SYSTEM HAVING THE STAPLER AND CARTRIDGE IN COMBINATION | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2004 | Translation filed | 25.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 08.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/47] | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0608756 (MAX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * figure - *; | [A]US5346114 (UDAGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 22, line 15 - column 24, line 52; figure - *; | [A]EP0704282 (MAX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2,5* column 3; figure - * | International search | [A]JPS60134586U ; | [A]JPH0497670U |