EP1432963 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERFACING MOBILE UNITS USING A CELLPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNK, Karsten 101 Glen Alpine Court Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/27] | 01 /
FUNK, Karsten 71 Eldora Drive Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02800353.1 | 24.09.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002US30274 | Priority number, date | US20010967729 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 967729 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03030560 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1432963 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/26 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
H04M3/4938 (EP,US);
G08G1/0968 (KR);
G01C21/3608 (EP,US);
G10L15/22 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04M2207/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/27] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR MOBILE EINHEITEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES MOBILTELEFONS | [2004/27] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTERFACING MOBILE UNITS USING A CELLPHONE | [2004/27] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR RELIER DES UNITES MOBILES AU MOYEN D'UN TELEPHONE CELLULAIRE | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 12.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.04.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 15.04.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/41] | Divisional application(s) | EP11196052.2 / EP2437032 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0632252 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-13,20,24-29,31-39 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 46 * * column 6, line 8 - line 19 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 20 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP0837341 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [X] 1-45 * column 8, line 27 - column 10, line 28 * * column 12, line 13 - line 44 * * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2762906 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-45 * page 1, line 4 - line 10 * * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 13 * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 24 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 10 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US6021371 (FULTZ ROBERT B [US]) [X] 1-3,5-13,20,22,24-29,31-39 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 43 * * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 29 ** figures 1,2,4,9 *; | [X]EP1063494 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13,20-39 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] - [0030] , [0033] - [0038] * * figures 2,3 * | International search | [XP]US6393292 (LIN CHING-FANG [US]); | [AP]US6438382 (BOESCH RONALD D [US], et al) | Examination | US5359527 | DE19717601 | US6108631 | WO0169178 | by applicant | EP0632252 | EP0837341 | FR2762906 | EP1063494 |