EP1435187 - CHANNELL ASSIGNMENTS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM HAVING SPATIAL CHANNELS INCLUDING GROUPING EXISTING SUBSCRIBERS IN ANTICIPATION OF NEW SUBSCRIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states ArrayComm LLC 2480 N. First Street, Suite 200 San Jose CA 95131-1014 / US | ||
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states ArrayComm, Inc. 2480 North First Street, Suite 200 San Jose, CA 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASAPI, Athanasios, Agamemnon 651 Castro Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 02 /
KHOURY, Peter, George 3549 23rd Street San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 03 /
ROGER, Anne-Flore 1550 Hayes Street 1 San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Collins, John David Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Collins, John David Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02800363.0 | 26.09.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002US30569 | Priority number, date | US20010968356 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 968356 | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03030573 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1435187 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435187 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/06 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
H04W72/046 (EP,US);
H04W16/06 (KR);
H04W4/08 (EP,US);
H04W72/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/28] | H04Q7/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/45] |
Former [2004/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANALZUWEISUNGEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT RÄUMLICHEN KANÄLEN, EINSCHLIESSLICH DER GRUPPIERUNG BESTEHENDER TEILNEHMER IN ERWARTUNG NEUER TEILNEHMER | [2004/28] | English: | CHANNELL ASSIGNMENTS IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM HAVING SPATIAL CHANNELS INCLUDING GROUPING EXISTING SUBSCRIBERS IN ANTICIPATION OF NEW SUBSCRIBERS | [2004/28] | French: | ATTRIBUTIONS DE CANAUX DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL A CANAUX SPATIAUX COMPRENANT LE REGROUPEMENT D'ABONNES EXISTANTS EN ANTICIPATION POUR UN NOUVEL ABONNE | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 29.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5886988 (YUN LOUIS C [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 26 ** column 11, line 29 - column 13, line 52 *; | [X]WO9960809 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,2,28,29 * page 7, line 10 - page 11, line 30 * * figures 3-7C * |