EP1437332 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL COLOUR PATTERN SLABS WHICH FORMED BY SINTERING CERAMIC POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Dening No. 713, Zhenlilou, Huaqiaocheng, Shenzhen Guangdong 518053 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Yang, Dening No. 713, Zhenlilou, Huaqiaocheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518053 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Jackson, Derek Charles Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town Claines Worcester WR3 7RY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02800531.2 | 09.09.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002CN00632 | Priority number, date | CN2001127837 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: CN 01127837 | [2004/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03031369 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1437332 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C04B33/14, C04B35/00 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
C04B33/14 (EP,US);
B32B2038/042 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24926 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH SINTERN VON KERAMIKPULVER HERGESTELLTE PLATTEN MIT DREIMENSIONALEM FARBMUSTER | [2004/29] | English: | THREE-DIMENSIONAL COLOUR PATTERN SLABS WHICH FORMED BY SINTERING CERAMIC POWDER | [2004/29] | French: | DALLES A MOTIFS DE COULEUR EN TROIS DIMENSIONS FORMEES PAR FRITTAGE DE POUDRE DE CERAMIQUE | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2004 | Translation filed | 08.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5459113 (NOZAKI TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [A]CN1081428 (DENG ZHENZHONG [CN]); | [A]CN1030203 (LIAO YUANLI [CN]); | [A]JPH06305815 (TOSOH CORP); | [A]JPS5761677 (ISHIZUKA GLASS, et al); | [A]JP2000281424 (RIVALL KK) |